Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc. et al v. Town of Eastchester et al
Plaintiff: Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc., Eastchester Service Station Inc., Eastchester Service Center Inc., Chestnut Marts Inc. and Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc.
Defendant: Town of Eastchester, Eastchester Town Board, Anthony S Colavita, Joseph Dooley, Luigi Marcoccia, Theresa Nicholson, Sheila Marcotte and Town of Eastchester Police Department
Case Number: 7:2021cv06996
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 dp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Town of Eastchester Police Department served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Swikata. Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc.; Eastchester Service Station Inc.; Chestnut Marts Inc.; Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.; Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Sheila Marcotte served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Swikata. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc.; Eastchester Service Station Inc.; Chestnut Marts Inc.; Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.; Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Theresa Nicholson served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Swikata. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc.; Eastchester Service Station Inc.; Chestnut Marts Inc.; Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.; Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Luigi Marcoccia served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Swikata. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc.; Eastchester Service Station Inc.; Chestnut Marts Inc.; Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.; Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Joseph Dooley served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Swikata. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc.; Eastchester Service Station Inc.; Chestnut Marts Inc.; Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.; Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Anthony S Colavita served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Swikata. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc.; Eastchester Service Station Inc.; Chestnut Marts Inc.; Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.; Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Eastchester Town Board served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Swikata. Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc.; Eastchester Service Station Inc.; Chestnut Marts Inc.; Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.; Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Town of Eastchester served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Swikata. Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc.; Eastchester Service Station Inc.; Chestnut Marts Inc.; Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.; Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony S Colavita, Joseph Dooley, Eastchester Town Board, Luigi Marcoccia, Sheila Marcotte, Theresa Nicholson, Town of Eastchester, Town of Eastchester Police Department. (vf)
September 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town of Eastchester, The Eastchester Town Board, Anthony S. Colavita, Joseph Dooley, Luigi Marcoccia, Theresa Nicholson, Sheila Marcotte, and The Town of Eastchester Police Department, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chestnut Marts Inc., Eastchester Service Center Inc., Eastchester Service Station Inc., Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc., Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Benjamin Moses Rattner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331ss Fed. Question: Constitutionality of State Statutes. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983dp Civil Right Denial of Due Process. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Benjamin Moses Rattner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rattner, Benjamin)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony S Colavita, Joseph Dooley, Eastchester Town Board, Luigi Marcoccia, Sheila Marcotte, Theresa Nicholson, Town of Eastchester, Town of Eastchester Police Department. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24956998)Document filed by Eastchester Service Center Inc., Eastchester Service Station Inc., Chestnut Marts Inc., Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc., Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc...(Rattner, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc. et al v. Town of Eastchester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastchester Tobacco & Vape Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Moses Rattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastchester Service Station Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Moses Rattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastchester Service Center Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Moses Rattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chestnut Marts Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Moses Rattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarsdale Auto Clinic Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Moses Rattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Eastchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastchester Town Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony S Colavita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luigi Marcoccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Marcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Eastchester Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?