Hauschild v. United States Marshals Service
Plaintiff: Daniel F. Hauschild
Defendant: United States Marshals Service
Case Number: 7:2021cv07580
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by United States Marshals Service. ENDORSEMENT: Telephonic pre-motion conference to be held on 11/29/21 at 12:30 pm. Plaintiff shall state his position, by letter of no more than 3 pages, by 11/22/21. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 11/29/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 11/8/2021) (mml)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Christine S. Poscablo dated November 8, 2021 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by United States Marshals Service..(Poscablo, Christine)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:13-cv-05211-CS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Christine S. Poscablo dated October 14, 2021 re: Due Date of Defendant's Response to Complaint and Notice of Related Case. Document filed by United States Marshals Service..(Poscablo, Christine)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Schessler Poscablo on behalf of United States Marshals Service..(Poscablo, Christine)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. United States Marshals Service served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Daniel F. Hauschild..(Swearengen, Kate)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Marshals Service. (sj)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to United States Marshals Service, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel F. Hauschild..(Swearengen, Kate)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kate Montgomery Swearengen to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; remove 'et al' from the PDF case caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to United States Marshals Service, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel F. Hauschild..(Swearengen, Kate) Modified on 9/20/2021 (jgo).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kate Montgomery Swearengen to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Swearengen, Kate)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Marshals Service, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel F. Hauschild..(Swearengen, Kate) Modified on 9/15/2021 (sj).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Marshals Service..(pc)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kate Montgomery Swearengen to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons. If you wish to serve at this address, list the defendant's name followed by c/o;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kate Montgomery Swearengen to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel F. Hauschild..(Swearengen, Kate) Modified on 9/13/2021 (pc).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Marshals Service, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel F. Hauschild..(Swearengen, Kate)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Swearengen, Kate) Modified on 9/13/2021 (pc).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Marshals Service. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25045198)Document filed by Daniel F. Hauschild..(Swearengen, Kate)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hauschild v. United States Marshals Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel F. Hauschild
Represented By: Kate Montgomery Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshals Service
Represented By: Christine Schessler Poscablo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?