Altair Logix LLC v. Universal Remote Control, Inc.
Plaintiff: Altair Logix LLC
Defendant: Universal Remote Control, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv08065
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas A. Miro dated November 24, 2021. Document filed by Universal Remote Control, Inc...(Miro, Douglas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas A. Miro dated November 1, 2021., #1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Universal Remote Control, Inc. answer due 12/3/2021. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/2/2021) (tg)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas A. Miro dated November 1, 2021. Document filed by Universal Remote Control, Inc...(Miro, Douglas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Universal Remote Control, Inc. served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Altair Logix LLC..(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
October 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
October 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so redesignated. (vba)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for David Randolph Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jb)
September 30, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for David Randolph Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for David Randolph Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David R. Bennett (notarized on second page), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Bennett, David)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Universal Remote Control, Inc...(jgo)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for David Randolph Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25124971. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission - Bennett, #2 Affidavit of David R. Bennett, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Bennett, David) Modified on 9/29/2021 (wb).
September 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicholas Netram Loaknauth. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
September 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 29, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for David Randolph Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25124971. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Notarized Affidavit/ Declaration;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Universal Remote Control, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Altair Logix LLC..(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Altair Logix LLC..(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Universal Remote Control, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25123590)Document filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: US Pat. No. 6,289,434).(Loaknauth, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altair Logix LLC v. Universal Remote Control, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altair Logix LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Netram Loaknauth
Represented By: David R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Remote Control, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Alan Miro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?