Singh et al v. MH Mobile 300 Inc.
Plaintiff: Kulwinder Singh and Bikramjit Singh
Defendant: MH MOBILE 300 INC doing business as Meadow Hill Mobil Mart, MH Mobile 300 Inc. doing business as Meadow Hill Mobil Mart, MH MOBIL INC doing business as Meadow Hill Mobil Mart and MH MOBIL 300 INC doing business as Meadow Hill Mobil Mart
Case Number: 7:2021cv08499
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MH MOBIL 300 INC, MH MOBIL INC..(gp)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MH MOBIL 300 INC d/b/a Meadow Hill Mobil Mart; MH MOBIL INC d/b/a Meadow Hill Mobil Mart, re: #7 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Bikramjit Singh, Kulwinder Singh..(Troy, John)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against MH MOBIL INC, MH MOBIL 300 INC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kulwinder Singh, Bikramjit Singh. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-01 Complaint (Red-Lined), #2 Exhibit 01-02 Notice to Enforce Shareholders Liability /gd, #3 Exhibit 01-03 Notice to Inspect Share Records /gd, #4 Exhibit 01-04 Document Preservation Demand /gd, #5 Exhibit 01-05 Notice of Assignment and Lien /gd, #6 Exhibit 01-06 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under FLSA and NYLL /gd).(Troy, John)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MH Mobile 300 Inc. (vf)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MH MOBILE 300 INC d/b/a Meadow Hill Mobil Mart, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bikramjit Singh, Kulwinder Singh..(Troy, John)
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error list on Summons and Summons caption. Party name contains a spelling error and does not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
October 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act. (vf)
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MH Mobile 300 Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name entered in all caps. (vf)
October 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-03853. Document filed by Bikramjit Singh, Kulwinder Singh..(Troy, John)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MH MOBIL 300 INC d/b/a Meadow Hill Mobil Mart, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bikramjit Singh, Kulwinder Singh..(Troy, John)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Troy, John)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MH MOBILE 300 INC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25199104)Document filed by Kulwinder Singh, Bikramjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholders Liability /gd, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records /gd, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand /gd, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment /gd, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under FLSA and NYLL /gd, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice that Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited /gd).(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh et al v. MH Mobile 300 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kulwinder Singh
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bikramjit Singh
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MH MOBILE 300 INC doing business as Meadow Hill Mobil Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MH Mobile 300 Inc. doing business as Meadow Hill Mobil Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MH MOBIL INC doing business as Meadow Hill Mobil Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MH MOBIL 300 INC doing business as Meadow Hill Mobil Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?