Seicol v. SoClean, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Seicol
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv08854
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jeffrey H. Warshafsky dated 11/18/2021. Application granted. The time for Defendants to serve and file a response to the Complaint is extended to and including 21 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation renders a decision on the pending Motion for Transfer and Coordination or Consolidation ("Motion"). The parties shall, however, file a letter providing the Court with a status update regarding the Motion on February 18, 2022. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion sequence pending at Doc. 3. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/19/2021) (jca)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jeffrey H. Warshafsky dated 11/18/2021. Document filed by SoClean, Inc...(Warshafsky, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Joseph Bailly. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $75,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000;. (jgo)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Joseph Bailly. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Seicol. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bailly, John)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SoClean, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25261064)Document filed by David Seicol..(Bailly, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seicol v. SoClean, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Seicol
Represented By: John Joseph Bailly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Warshafsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?