Goldner v. 64 Solar LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul Goldner
Defendant: 64 Solar LLC, 64 Solar Asset Management LLC and Craig Harrigan
Case Number: 7:2021cv08917
Filed: October 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Craig Harrigan served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. Service was accepted by Craig Harrigan. Document filed by Paul Goldner..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 64 Solar Asset Management LLC served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. Service was accepted by Craig Harrigan. Document filed by Paul Goldner..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 64 Solar LLC served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. Service was accepted by Craig Harrigan. Document filed by Paul Goldner..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 64 Solar Asset Management LLC, 64 Solar LLC, Craig Harrigan. (sj)
November 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1330; Nature of Suit code 190 (Contract: Other). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 790 (Labor: Other). (sj)
October 31, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 64 Solar LLC, 64 Solar Asset Management LLC, and Craig Harrigan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Goldner..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
October 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
October 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 64 Solar Asset Management LLC, 64 Solar LLC, Craig Harrigan. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25267793)Document filed by Paul Goldner..(Taubenfeld, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldner v. 64 Solar LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Goldner
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 64 Solar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 64 Solar Asset Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?