White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC v. HBL SNF LLC et al
Plaintiff: White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC
Defendant: HBL SNF LLC, Lizer Jozefovic and Lizer Jozofovic
Counter Claimant: Mark Neuman
3Rd Party Defendant: CCC Equities, LLC, Project Equity Consulting, Congress Companies, Howard Fensterman and William Nicholson
Consolidated Defendant: Metropolitan Commercial Bank
Case Number: 7:2021cv09048
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Tracy on behalf of Metropolitan Commercial Bank..(Tracy, James)
November 10, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Jerome Malatak on behalf of Metropolitan Commercial Bank..(Malatak, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 21-22623. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (gp)
November 8, 2021 USBC case number 21-7096 (SHL)..(gp)
November 8, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York..(gp)
November 5, 2021 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC..(Scott, Brendan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by CCC Equities, LLC, Congress Companies, Howard Fensterman, William Nicholson, Project Equity Consulting, White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC..(Donnellan, Alfred)
November 5, 2021 Filing 39 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Edward O. Tabor in Support. Document filed by CCC Equities, LLC, Congress Companies, Howard Fensterman, William Nicholson, Project Equity Consulting, White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC..(Donnellan, Alfred)
November 5, 2021 Filing 38 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of William Nicholson in Support. Document filed by CCC Equities, LLC, Congress Companies, Howard Fensterman, William Nicholson, Project Equity Consulting, White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC..(Donnellan, Alfred)
November 5, 2021 Filing 37 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Alfred E. Donnellan in Support. Document filed by CCC Equities, LLC, Congress Companies, Howard Fensterman, William Nicholson, Project Equity Consulting, White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Donnellan, Alfred)
November 5, 2021 Filing 36 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CCC Equities, LLC, Congress Companies, Howard Fensterman, William Nicholson, Project Equity Consulting, White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC..(Donnellan, Alfred)
November 5, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A Spolzino on behalf of CCC Equities, LLC, Congress Companies, Howard Fensterman, William Nicholson, Project Equity Consulting, White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC..(Spolzino, Robert)
November 5, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred E. Donnellan on behalf of CCC Equities, LLC, Congress Companies, Howard Fensterman, William Nicholson, Project Equity Consulting, White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC..(Donnellan, Alfred)
November 4, 2021 Filing 33 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scott, Brendan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 60278/2020..Document filed by HBL SNF LLC..(Klestadt, Tracy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC..(Scott, Brendan)
November 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brendan Michael Scott to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
November 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brendan Michael Scott. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $84,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
November 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brendan Michael Scott. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lizer Jozefovic. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
November 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brendan Michael Scott re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Metropolitan Commercial Bank to CM ECF.. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
November 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brendan Michael Scott to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. (pc)
November 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Brendan Michael Scott. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: HBL SNF LLC, Lizer Jozefovic, Mark Neuman, White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC as Counter Claimants. The parties were added to the case in error. (pc)
November 4, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Metropolitan Commercial Bank added. Party added pursuant to #32 Notice of Removal.Document filed by HBL SNF LLC, Metropolitan Commercial Bank. Related document: #32 Notice of Removal..(Scott, Brendan)
November 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 253, #2 DE 254, #3 DE 255, #4 DE 256, #5 DE 257, #6 DE 258, #7 DE 259, #8 DE 260, #9 DE 261, #10 DE 262, #11 DE 264, #12 DE 265, #13 DE 266, #14 DE 267, #15 DE 268, #16 DE 270, #17 DE 271, #18 DE 272).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 231, #2 DE 232, #3 DE 233, #4 DE 234, #5 DE 235, #6 DE 236, #7 DE 237, #8 DE 238, #9 DE 240, #10 DE 241, #11 DE 243, #12 DE 244, #13 DE 245, #14 DE 246, #15 DE 247, #16 DE 248, #17 DE 249, #18 DE 251, #19 DE 252).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 216, #2 DE 218, #3 DE 219, #4 DE 220, #5 DE 221, #6 DE 222, #7 DE 223, #8 DE 224, #9 DE 225, #10 DE 226, #11 DE 227, #12 DE 228, #13 DE 229, #14 DE 230).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 200, #2 DE 201, #3 DE 202, #4 DE 203, #5 DE 204, #6 DE 205, #7 DE 207, #8 DE 208, #9 DE 209, #10 DE 210, #11 DE 211, #12 DE 212, #13 DE 213, #14 DE 214, #15 DE 215).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 186, #2 DE 187, #3 DE 188, #4 DE 189, #5 DE 190, #6 DE 191, #7 DE 192, #8 DE 193, #9 DE 194, #10 DE 196, #11 DE 198, #12 DE 199).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 176, #2 DE 177, #3 DE 178, #4 DE 181, #5 DE 182, #6 DE 183, #7 DE 184, #8 DE 185).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 163, #2 DE 164, #3 DE 166, #4 DE 167, #5 DE 168, #6 DE 169, #7 DE 170, #8 DE 171, #9 DE 172, #10 DE 173, #11 DE 174, #12 DE 175).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 161, #2 DE 162).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 159, #2 DE 160).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 156, #2 DE 157, #3 DE 158).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 139, #2 DE 140, #3 DE 141, #4 DE 142, #5 DE 144, #6 DE 146, #7 DE 147, #8 DE 148, #9 DE 149, #10 DE 150, #11 DE 151, #12 DE 152, #13 DE 153, #14 DE 154).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 137, #2 DE 138).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 126, #2 DE 127, #3 DE 128, #4 DE 129, #5 DE 130, #6 DE 131, #7 DE 132, #8 DE 133, #9 DE 134, #10 DE 135).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 121, #2 DE 122, #3 DE 123, #4 DE 124, #5 DE 125).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 111, #2 DE 112, #3 DE 113, #4 DE 114, #5 DE 115, #6 DE 116, #7 DE 117, #8 DE 118, #9 DE 119, #10 DE 120).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 93, #2 DE 94, #3 DE 95, #4 DE 96, #5 DE 97, #6 DE 98, #7 DE 99, #8 DE 101, #9 DE 102, #10 DE 103, #11 DE 104, #12 DE 105, #13 DE 106, #14 DE 107, #15 DE 108, #16 DE 110).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 89, #2 DE 92).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 88).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 85, #2 DE 86, #3 DE 90, #4 DE 91).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 76, #2 DE 77, #3 DE 78, #4 DE 79, #5 DE 80, #6 DE 81, #7 DE 82, #8 DE 83, #9 DE 84).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 68, #2 DE 69, #3 DE 70, #4 DE 71, #5 DE 72, #6 DE 73, #7 DE 74, #8 DE 75).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 61, #2 DE 62, #3 DE 63, #4 DE 65, #5 DE 66, #6 DE 67).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 54, #2 DE 56, #3 DE 57, #4 DE 58, #5 DE 59, #6 DE 60).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 41, #2 DE 42, #3 DE 43, #4 DE 44, #5 DE 45, #6 DE 46, #7 DE 47, #8 DE 48, #9 DE 49, #10 DE 50, #11 DE 51, #12 DE 52).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 37, #2 DE 38, #3 DE 39, #4 DE 40).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 31, #2 DE 32, #3 DE 34, #4 DE 35, #5 DE 36).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 21, #2 DE 22, #3 DE 23, #4 DE 24, #5 DE 25, #6 DE 26, #7 DE 27, #8 DE 28, #9 DE 29, #10 DE 30).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket. Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 1, #2 DE 2, #3 DE 3, #4 DE 4, #5 DE 5, #6 DE 6, #7 DE 7, #8 DE 8, #9 DE 9, #10 DE 10, #11 DE 11, #12 DE 12, #13 DE 13, #14 DE 14, #15 DE 15, #16 DE 16, #17 DE 17, #18 DE 18, #19 DE 19, #20 DE 20).(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scott, Brendan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, State of New York, County of Westchester. Case Number: 60278/2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-25282592).Document filed by HBL SNF LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet).(Scott, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC v. HBL SNF LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Plains Healthcare Properties I, LLC
Represented By: Alfred E. Donnellan
Represented By: Robert A Spolzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBL SNF LLC
Represented By: Brendan Michael Scott
Represented By: Tracy Lee Klestadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizer Jozefovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizer Jozofovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mark Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CCC Equities, LLC
Represented By: Alfred E. Donnellan
Represented By: Robert A Spolzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Project Equity Consulting
Represented By: Alfred E. Donnellan
Represented By: Robert A Spolzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Congress Companies
Represented By: Alfred E. Donnellan
Represented By: Robert A Spolzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Howard Fensterman
Represented By: Alfred E. Donnellan
Represented By: Robert A Spolzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: William Nicholson
Represented By: Alfred E. Donnellan
Represented By: Robert A Spolzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Metropolitan Commercial Bank
Represented By: Robert Jerome Malatak
Represented By: James Patrick Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?