Jessamy v. Lamanna
Petitioner: Thomas L. Jessamy
Respondent: Amy Lamanna
Case Number: 7:2021cv09242
Filed: November 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Judith C McCarthy
Referring Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
2 Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Original Signature to Thomas L. Jessamy, 19-A-0719 at Green Haven Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 4000, Stormville, NY 12582-4000. (kh)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING ORIGINAL SIGNATURES: Petitioner is directed to submit signed signature pages to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signature Pages due by 12/9/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on November 9, 2021) (Attachments: #1 Petition Signature Page, #2 IFP Application Signature Page) (jjg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 9, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. County of Conviction: Westchester. Document filed by Thomas L. Jessamy.(rdz)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Thomas L. Jessamy..(rdz)
November 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jessamy v. Lamanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas L. Jessamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amy Lamanna
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: WESTCHESTER COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GEN
Represented By: John Joseph Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?