Combe Incorporated v. Inova Cosmetics
Plaintiff: Combe Incorporated
Defendant: Inova Cosmetics and Inova Urun Gelistirme ve Kozmetik Uretim Ltd. Sti. doing business as Inova Cosmetics
Case Number: 7:2021cv09308
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Inova Urun Gelistirme ve Kozmetik Uretim Ltd. Sti...(pc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Inova Urun Gelistirme ve Kozmetik Uretim Ltd. Sti. (Combe Incorporated spelling error), re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Combe Incorporated..(Wong, Ha Kung)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Inova Urun Gelistirme ve Kozmetik Uretim Ltd. Sti. d/b/a Inova Cosmetics with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Combe Incorporated. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - US 9237993, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - US 9474704, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - US 10022312).(Wong, Ha Kung)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Inova Cosmetics, re: #9 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Combe Incorporated..(Wong, Ha Kung) Modified on 12/16/2021 (vf).
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Inova Cosmetics with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Combe Incorporated. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Wong, Ha Kung) Modified on 12/16/2021 (vf).
December 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ha Kung Wong. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Inova Urun Gelistirme ve Kozmetik Uretim Ltd. Sti. d/b/a Inova Cosmetics. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
December 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ha Kung Wong to RE-FILE re: Document No. #9 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
December 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ha Kung Wong to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Docket Entry Error. Enter the party name as to whom summons is being issued for when prompted; and Plaintiff party name spelling error in Summons Caption. Party name must correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Inova Cosmetics. (vf)
November 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ha Kung Wong. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (vf)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Wong, Ha Kung)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Wong, Ha Kung) Modified on 11/12/2021 (vf).
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Inova Cosmetics, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Combe Incorporated..(Wong, Ha Kung)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Combe Incorporated..(Wong, Ha Kung)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wong, Ha Kung)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Inova Cosmetics. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25317289)Document filed by Combe Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Wong, Ha Kung)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combe Incorporated v. Inova Cosmetics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combe Incorporated
Represented By: Ha Kung Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inova Cosmetics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inova Urun Gelistirme ve Kozmetik Uretim Ltd. Sti. doing business as Inova Cosmetics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?