Reich et al v. Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Reich
Defendant: Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Casabella Landscaping, Inc., Doe General Contractor and Doe Surety Company
Case Number: 7:2021cv09327
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brooke Dana Youngwirth on behalf of Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc...(Youngwirth, Brooke)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brooke Dana Youngwirth on behalf of Casabella Landscaping, Inc...(Youngwirth, Brooke)
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Casabella Landscaping, Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Document filed by Stephen Reich(in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee for the Laborers Local 754 Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Savings Fund, Annuity Fund, Industry Advancement Fund, NY Health and Saftey Fund of North America, NYS Lecet Fund, NYSLPA Fund, Laborers' Training Fund...); Stephen Reich(as the Business Manager of the Laborers Local Union 754 )..(Dell, Carol)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. Document filed by Stephen Reich(in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee for the Laborers Local 754 Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Savings Fund, Annuity Fund, Industry Advancement Fund, NY Health and Saftey Fund of North America, NYS Lecet Fund, NYSLPA Fund, Laborers' Training Fund...); Stephen Reich(as the Business Manager of the Laborers Local Union 754 )..(Dell, Carol)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua E. MacKey on behalf of Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc...(MacKey, Joshua)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pedro Medina, Jr on behalf of Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc...(Medina, Pedro)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pedro Medina, Jr on behalf of Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc...(Medina, Pedro)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Casabella Landscaping, Inc.. (vf)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc.. (vf)
November 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Carol Giuliano Dell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted. (vf)
November 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Carol Giuliano Dell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Stephen Reich(in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee for the LABORERS LOCAL 754 WELFARE, PENSION, SAVINGS & ANNUITY FUNDS, IND. ADV. FUND, NY HEALTH & SAFETY FUND OF N.A., NYS LECET FUND, NYSLPA FUND, LABORERS' TRAINING FUND, 754 LMC, & 754/CONT. ORG. & DEV. FUND), Stephen Reich(as the Business Manager of the LABORERS LOCAL UNION 754).. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered in all caps; party text entered incorrectly. (vf)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Meredith Morgan on behalf of Stephen Reich(in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee for the LABORERS LOCAL 754 WELFARE, PENSION, SAVINGS & ANNUITY FUNDS, IND. ADV. FUND, NY HEALTH & SAFETY FUND OF N.A., NYS LECET FUND, NYSLPA FUND, LABORERS' TRAINING FUND, 754 LMC, & 754/CONT. ORG. & DEV. FUND), Stephen Reich(as the Business Manager of the LABORERS LOCAL UNION 754)..(Morgan, Katherine)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Giuliano Dell on behalf of Stephen Reich(in his fiduciary capacity as a Trustee for the LABORERS LOCAL 754 WELFARE, PENSION, SAVINGS & ANNUITY FUNDS, IND. ADV. FUND, NY HEALTH & SAFETY FUND OF N.A., NYS LECET FUND, NYSLPA FUND, LABORERS' TRAINING FUND, 754 LMC, & 754/CONT. ORG. & DEV. FUND), Stephen Reich(as the Business Manager of the LABORERS LOCAL UNION 754)..(Dell, Carol)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Casabella Landscaping, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Reich, Stephen Reich (as the Business Manager of the Laborers Local Union 754).(Dell, Carol)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Reich, Stephen Reich(as the Business Manager of the Laborers Local Union 754).(Dell, Carol)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dell, Carol)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Casabella Landscaping, Inc., Doe General Contractor, Doe Surety Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25320619)Document filed by Stephen Reich, Stephen Reich(as the Business Manager of the Laborers Local Union 754).(Dell, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reich et al v. Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Reich
Represented By: Katherine Meredith Morgan
Represented By: Carol Giuliano Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc.
Represented By: Brooke Dana Youngwirth
Represented By: Joshua E. MacKey
Represented By: Pedro Medina, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casabella Landscaping, Inc.
Represented By: Brooke Dana Youngwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe General Contractor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?