Garrison v. American Sugar Refining, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Davall Garrison
Defendant: American Sugar Refining, Inc., American Sugar Holdings, Inc. and ASR Group International, Inc.,
Case Number: 7:2021cv10917
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff's complaint shall be served and filed by 2/18/2022. Defendants shall file their answer or other response to the complaint by 4/18/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
December 23, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Answer or Otherwise Respond. addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Lawrence R. Sandak dated 12/23/2021. Document filed by ASR Group International, Inc.,, American Sugar Holdings, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc...(Sandak, Lawrence)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Sarah Goddard on behalf of Davall Garrison..(Goddard, Megan)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filling of Notice of Removal served on Megan Goddard, Esq. and Siobhan Klassen, Esq. and County Clerk, Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester on December 20, 2021 and Service was made via NYSCEF E-filing System, and of Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, Individual Rules for the Hon. Vincent L. Briccetti, Individual Rules for Hon. Paul E. Davison, and the SDNY ECF Instructions and Rules served on Megan S. Goddard, Esq. and Siobhan Klassen, Esq. on December 21 2021 served on Plaintiff Davall Garrison on December 21, 2021. Service was made by United States Mail and Electronic Mail. Document filed by ASR Group International, Inc.,, American Sugar Holdings, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc...(Grossman-Boder, Yonatan)
December 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yonatan L Grossman-Boder on behalf of ASR Group International, Inc.,, American Sugar Holdings, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc...(Grossman-Boder, Yonatan)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ASR Group International, Inc., for American Sugar Refining, Inc.. Document filed by American Sugar Holdings, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc...(Sandak, Lawrence)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sandak, Lawrence)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 56951/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25494574).Document filed by ASR Group International, Inc.,, American Sugar Holdings, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Sandak, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison v. American Sugar Refining, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davall Garrison
Represented By: Megan Sarah Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sugar Refining, Inc.
Represented By: Yonatan L Grossman-Boder
Represented By: Lawrence Roy Sandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sugar Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Yonatan L Grossman-Boder
Represented By: Lawrence Roy Sandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASR Group International, Inc.,
Represented By: Yonatan L Grossman-Boder
Represented By: Lawrence Roy Sandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?