Golden Taste, Inc. v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Golden Taste, Inc.
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2022cv00017
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Toren on behalf of Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Toren, Jonathan)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Plaintiff anticipates filing a jury demand. Defendant reserves all rights as to any late-filed jury demand. Motions due by 3/16/2022. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by June 14, 2022. Expert Deposition due by 7/29/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/14/2022. Expert Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Discovery due by 8/15/2022. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of the trial is 3 days. Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. 16. The parties are directed to discuss settlement in good faith. By no later than June 21, 2022, counsel shall submit a joint letter regarding the status of their discussions and whether there is anything the Court can do to assist in that regard. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/14/2022) (mml)
February 14, 2022 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Golden Taste, Inc..(Fried, Noah)
February 14, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Jordan Fried on behalf of Golden Taste, Inc...(Fried, Noah)
February 14, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/14/2022. Case management plan signed. Joint letter due 6-21-22. Next conference is scheduled for 8-18-22 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 620. (dh)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Jonathan Toren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Jonathan Toren, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is hereby GRANTED. DONE AND ORDERED in White Plains, New York on this 11th day of February, 2022. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/11/2022) (vfr)
February 10, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Jonathan Toren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 9, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Jonathan Toren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Return Date set for 2/14/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent Passarelli, #2 Affidavit of Jonathan Toren, #3 Exhibit WA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit MA Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit NY Cert. of Good Standing, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Passarelli, Vincent)
February 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Jonathan Toren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25702338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit not notarized per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 8, 2022 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan Toren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25702338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Return Date set for 2/14/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Affirmation of Vincent Passarelli, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Jonathan Toren, #3 Exhibit WA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit MA Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Passarelli, Vincent) Modified on 2/9/2022 (bcu).
February 7, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Passarelli, Vincent)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: By 2/7/2022, counsel shall complete and file on the ECF docket their proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti) (Text Only Order) (jsy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR A TELEPHONIC INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on 2-14-22 at 12:00 pm. All counsel and/or parties shall use the following information to appear at the conference by telephone: Dial-In Number: (888) 363-4749 (toll free) or (215) 446-3662. Access Code: 1703567. Initial Conference set for 2/14/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.(ate)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Passarelli, Vincent)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Passarelli, Vincent)
January 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vincent Passarelli. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; Cause of Action code 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1441nr Notice of Removal; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
January 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Vincent Passarelli to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb US Holdings, Inc. for Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Passarelli, Vincent)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #7) SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb US Holdings, Inc. for Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Passarelli, Vincent) Modified on 1/4/2022 (lb).
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland County. Case Number: 036436/2021..Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings).(Passarelli, Vincent) Modified on 1/4/2022 (vf).
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Passarelli on behalf of Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Passarelli, Vincent)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Passarelli, Vincent) Modified on 1/3/2022 (lb).
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Passarelli, Vincent) Modified on 1/4/2022 (vf).
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland County. Case Number: 036436/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25530119).Document filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings).(Passarelli, Vincent)
January 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Vincent Passarelli to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not all Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Taste, Inc. v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Taste, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Vincent Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?