Bamonte et al v. Charatan
Plaintiff: Carol Bamonte, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon and Mary Hughes
Defendant: Debrah Lee Charatan
Case Number: 7:2022cv00795
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 wd Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court granted the TRO only after considering the extensive papers filed in support of the application, but set an expedited briefing schedule to allow Defendant to challenge the TRO and the request for a preliminary injunction. Instead of complying with this schedule, Defendant's counsel, who only filed a notice of appearance yesterday after being asked to, now seeks a substantial extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' submission. The request is granted, on consent of Plaintiffs and with the consent of Defendant to allow the TRO to remain in place until the Court holds a hearing. Defense opposition papers are due 4/12/22. Plaintiffs' reply is due 4/19/22. The Court will move the hearing from 3/25/22 to 4/20/22, at 2:00 pm. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/22/2022) (mml)
March 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: (Replies due by 4/19/2022. Show Cause Response due by 4/12/2022.) Set/Reset Hearings: (Show Cause Hearing set for 4/20/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (mml)
March 21, 2022 Filing 25 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Scott W. Epstein dated March 21, 2022. Document filed by Debrah Lee Charatan..(Epstein, Scott)
March 21, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott W. Epstein on behalf of Debrah Lee Charatan..(Epstein, Scott)
March 18, 2022 Filing 27 Undertaking for Security for Costs BOND # CGB 9357499 in the amount of $ 500.00 posted by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon. (fk)
March 18, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of OSC, MOL, ROBERT ABRAMS DECLARATION, EXHIBITS A-GG served on JEFFREY ANTIN/SCOTT EPSTEIN on MARCH 18, 2022. Service was accepted by 7TH FLOOR RECEPTIONIST AT 49 WEST 37TH STREET. Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(Sundaran, Raju)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Defendant or her attorney appear and show cause in Room 521 of the United States Courthouse located at 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601, or as otherwise directed by the Court, on the 25 day of March, 2022, at 10:00 am of said day, or as soon thereafter as counsel can be heard, why an order should not be issued: As further set forth by this Order. SUFFICIENT reason appearing therefor, it is hereby ORDERED, that pending a hearing and determination of Plaintiffs' motion, Defendant is hereby temporarily restrained pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. and N.Y. C.P.L.R. Section Section 6311, 6313 from selling, transferring, conveying, assigning, accepting, or otherwise disposing of Decedent's assets or properties in the United States, whether held individually, jointly, in trust, or in which Decedent may have an interest in, including but not limited to bank accounts, cash assets, debts, personal property, stock certificates/shares, and real property; and it is further ORDERED, that security in the amount of $500 be posted by Plaintiffs by March 18, 2022, at 5:00 p.m.; and it if further ORDERED, that personal service of a copy of this Order, and the papers on which it is based, upon Defendant Debrah Lee Charatan or her attorney, on or before March 18, 2022, at 5:00 p.m., be deemed sufficient service, and that any answering papers be filed by ECF nolater than March 22, 2022 at 3:00 p.m., and reply be served and filed byMarch 24, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. As stated above, the Court will hold a hearing at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, March 25, 2022. Motions terminated: #18 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Prejudgment Attachment, Preliminary Injunction/TRO, and Special Discovery. filed by James McCormack, Virginia McKeon, Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes. (Replies due by 3/24/2022.) ( Show Cause Hearing set for 3/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas., Show Cause Response due by 3/22/2022.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/17/2022) (tg) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
March 17, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of ROBERT ABRAMS in Support re: #18 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Prejudgment Attachment, Preliminary Injunction/TRO, and Special Discovery.. Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Durst Indictment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Westchester DA Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sentencing Transcript 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sentencing Transcript 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - DDA Lewin DV Motion, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - DDA Lewin Durst Company Theft Motion, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - EC Ltr re: Durst to Jareki, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 4, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 5, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H - Petition for Letters, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I - Robert Durst Surrogate Court Affidavit, #15 Exhibit Exhibit J - Robert Durst Divorce Complaint, #16 Exhibit Exhibit K - Robert Durst Divorce Affidavit, #17 Exhibit Exhibit L - Judgment of Divorce, #18 Exhibit Exhibit M - DDA Lewin Berman Hearsay Statements, #19 Exhibit Exhibit N - Marriage Registration Certificate, #20 Exhibit Exhibit O - POA from Robert Durst to Debrah L. Charatan, #21 Exhibit Exhibit P - Holm Obituaries, #22 Exhibit Exhibit Q - Letter from Robert Durst to Anton, #23 Exhibit Exhibit R - Daily Mail Article 3/31/15, #24 Exhibit Exhibit S - Last Will and Testament of Robert Durst, #25 Exhibit Exhibit T - Transcript of Debrah L. Charatan, #26 Exhibit Exhibit U - Judgment of Conviction Tampering with Physical Evid., #27 Exhibit Exhibit V - Transcript of Jail Recording between Robert Durst and Altman, #28 Exhibit Exhibit W - Pandora Letter re Robert Durst (REDACTED), #29 Exhibit Exhibit X - SDNY Trust Litigation Decision 12/7/05, #30 Exhibit Exhibit Y - Transcript of Jail Recording between Robert Durst and Debrah L. Charatan, #31 Exhibit Exhibit Z - SDNY Trust Litigation Complaint, #32 Exhibit Exhibit AA - Douglas Durst Trial Testimony 1, #33 Exhibit Exhibit AA - Douglas Durst Trial Testimony 2, #34 Exhibit Exhibit AA - Douglas Durst Trial Testimony 3, #35 Exhibit Exhibit BB - NYT Article 1/1/15, #36 Exhibit Exhibit CC - CA Arrest Warrant for Robert Durst (REDACTED), #37 Exhibit Exhibit DD - Trial Transcript Susan Giordano AM 2/15/17, #38 Exhibit Exhibit EE - Robert Durst Death Certificate (REDACTED), #39 Exhibit Exhibit FF - Probate Petition Estate of Robert Durst, #40 Exhibit Exhibit GG - Citation Returned).(Sundaran, Raju)
March 17, 2022 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #21) - DECLARATION of RAJU SUNDARAN in Support re: #18 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Prejudgment Attachment, Preliminary Injunction/TRO, and Special Discovery.. Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Durst Indictment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Westchester DA Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sentencing Transcript 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sentencing Transcript 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - DDA Lewin DV Motion, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - DDA Lewin Durst Company Theft Motion, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - EC Ltr re: Durst to Jareki, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 4, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G - Opp Morris Black Motion 5, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H - Petition for Letters, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I - Robert Durst Surrogate Court Affidavit, #15 Exhibit Exhibit J - Robert Durst Divorce Complaint, #16 Exhibit Exhibit K - Robert Durst Divorce Affidavit, #17 Exhibit Exhibit L - Judgment of Divorce, #18 Exhibit Exhibit M - DDA Lewin Berman Hearsay Statements, #19 Exhibit Exhibit N - Marriage Registration Certificate, #20 Exhibit Exhibit O - POA from Robert Durst to Debrah L. Charatan, #21 Exhibit Exhibit P - Holm Obituaries, #22 Exhibit Exhibit Q - Letter from Robert Durst to Anton, #23 Exhibit Exhibit R - Daily Mail Article 3/31/15, #24 Exhibit Exhibit S - Last Will and Testament of Robert Durst, #25 Exhibit Exhibit T - Transcript of Debrah L. Charatan, #26 Exhibit Exhibit U - Judgment of Conviction Tampering with Physical Evid., #27 Exhibit Exhibit V - Transcript of Jail Recording between Robert Durst and Altman, #28 Exhibit Exhibit X - SDNY Trust Litigation Decision 12/7/05, #29 Exhibit Exhibit Y - Transcript of Jail Recording between Robert Durst and Debrah L. Charatan, #30 Exhibit Exhibit Z - SDNY Trust Litigation Complaint, #31 Exhibit Exhibit AA - Douglas Durst Trial Testimony 1, #32 Exhibit Exhibit AA - Douglas Durst Trial Testimony 2, #33 Exhibit Exhibit AA - Douglas Durst Trial Testimony 3, #34 Exhibit Exhibit BB - NYT Article 1/1/15, #35 Exhibit Exhibit CC - CA Arrest Warrant for Robert Durst (REDACTED), #36 Exhibit Exhibit W - Pandora Letter re Robert Durst (REDACTED), #37 Exhibit Exhibit DD - Trial Transcript Susan Giordano AM 2/15/17, #38 Exhibit Exhibit EE - Robert Durst Death Certificate (REDACTED), #39 Exhibit Exhibit FF - Probate Petition Estate of Robert Durst, #40 Exhibit Exhibit GG - Citation Returned).(Sundaran, Raju) Modified on 3/17/2022 (lb).
March 17, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Prejudgment Attachment, Preliminary Injunction/TRO, and Special Discovery. . Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(Sundaran, Raju)
March 17, 2022 Filing 18 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Prejudgment Attachment, Preliminary Injunction/TRO, and Special Discovery. Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(Sundaran, Raju)
March 16, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raju Sundaran on behalf of Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(Sundaran, Raju)
March 8, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Scott W. Epstein dated March 8, 2022 re: in Response to Plaintiff's letter of March 4, 2022. Document filed by Debrah Lee Charatan..(Antin, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Cono Capozzoli on behalf of Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(Capozzoli, Matthew)
March 4, 2022 Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Response to Motion, filed by James McCormack, Virginia McKeon, Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs may file their motion whenever they choose. Defendant is to respond to this letter by 3/8/22. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/4/2022) (rro)
March 4, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brian Thomas McCarthy dated March 4, 2022 re: #11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Scott W. Epstein dated March 3, 2022. . Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(McCarthy, Brian)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Scott W. Epstein dated March 3, 2022. This request is entirely reasonable and is granted. So Ordered. Debrah Lee Charatan answer due 4/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/3/2022) (js)
March 3, 2022 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Scott W. Epstein dated March 3, 2022. Document filed by Debrah Lee Charatan..(Antin, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jme)
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Antin on behalf of Debrah Lee Charatan..(Antin, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Debrah Lee Charatan served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. Service was accepted by T. Michael Ballases, Resident Agent for Service of Process for Defendant, Debrah Lee Charatan, as Executor of the Estate of Robert Durst. Document filed by Mary Hughes; Carol Bamonte; Virginia McKeon; James McCormack..(McCarthy, Brian)
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Debrah Lee Charatan..(lal)
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Debrah Lee Charatan, as the Nominated Executor of the Estate of Robert Durst, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(McCarthy, Brian)
February 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian T. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct, Defendant name error, must match caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Debrah Lee Charatan, as Nominated Executor of the Estate of Robert Durst, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(McCarthy, Brian) Modified on 2/3/2022 (lal).
February 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian T. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct, (Typo in caption). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Debrah Lee Charatan, as Nominated Executor of the Estate of Robert Durst, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon..(McCarthy, Brian) Modified on 2/2/2022 (lal).
February 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian T. McCarthy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Suffolk. (sj)
February 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian T. McCarthy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Carol Bamonte, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon, Mary Hughes, Debrah Lee Charatan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
February 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian T. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name error in caption (Mary Hughes). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Debrah Lee Charatan, as Nominated Executor of the Estate of Robert Durst, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carol Bamonte, Mary Hughes, James McCormack, Virginia McKeon.(McCarthy, Brian) Modified on 2/1/2022 (sj).
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCarthy, Brian)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Debrah Lee Charatan. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25657367)Document filed by Mary Hughes, Carol Bamonte, Virginia McKeon, James McCormack..(McCarthy, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bamonte et al v. Charatan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Bamonte
Represented By: Brian T. McCarthy
Represented By: Matthew Cono Capozzoli
Represented By: Raju Sundaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McCormack
Represented By: Brian T. McCarthy
Represented By: Matthew Cono Capozzoli
Represented By: Raju Sundaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia McKeon
Represented By: Brian T. McCarthy
Represented By: Matthew Cono Capozzoli
Represented By: Raju Sundaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hughes
Represented By: Brian T. McCarthy
Represented By: Matthew Cono Capozzoli
Represented By: Raju Sundaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debrah Lee Charatan
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Antin
Represented By: Scott W. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?