O'Connor-Cole v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Patricia O'Connor-Cole
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 7:2022cv00865
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Civil Enforcement of Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Kevin G. Horbatiuk dated March 9, 2022. Granted. So Ordered. Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 4/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/15/2022) (va)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Kevin G. Horbatiuk dated March 9, 2022. Document filed by Life Insurance Company of North America..(Horbatiuk, Kevin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Gerard Horbatiuk on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Service).(Horbatiuk, Kevin)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Noah Breazeale to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned matter is granted. This Order becomes effective upon the Court's receipt of the required $150.00 fee and confirms your appearance as counsel in this case. A notation of your admission pro hac vice in the above-listed case will be made on the roll of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/7/22) (yv)
February 7, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Noah Breazeale to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25685162. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Noah Breazeale to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25685162. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patricia O'Connor-Cole. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Breazeale, Noah)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (sj)
February 2, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Noah Breazeale. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
February 2, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 2, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Life Insurance Company of North America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia O'Connor-Cole..(Breazeale, Noah)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Breazeale, Noah)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25667488)Document filed by Patricia O'Connor-Cole..(Breazeale, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor-Cole v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia O'Connor-Cole
Represented By: Noah Breazeale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Horbatiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?