Quest Diagnostics Incorporated v. Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing
Plaintiff: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Defendant: Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing
Case Number: 7:2022cv00957
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: By 4/15/2022, defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (jsy)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, #7 Affidavit of Service Complaints, addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Martin Bienstock dated March 11, 2022. Document filed by Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing..(Bienstock, Martin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022. Service was accepted by JANE DOE - REFUSED TO PROVIDE NAME RECEPTIONIST. Document filed by Quest Diagnostics Incorporated..(Glennon, Peter)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing..(lal)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Quest Diagnostics Incorporated..(Glennon, Peter)
February 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter John Glennon to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Filing Court omitted on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Quest Diagnostics Incorporated.(Glennon, Peter) Modified on 2/7/2022 (sj).
February 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter John Glennon to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the summons and caption title does not match;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter John Glennon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $436,000; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $437,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
February 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Glennon, Peter)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Quest Diagnostics Incorporated..(Glennon, Peter) Modified on 2/4/2022 (pc).
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25679457)Document filed by Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY DOH Contract, #2 Exhibit LTC Contract, #3 Exhibit Invoices).(Glennon, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated v. Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By: Peter John Glennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adria at Riverside Rehabilitation & Nursing
Represented By: Martin Bienstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?