Suozzo v. Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Suozzo
Defendant: Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc. and Russell S. Geller
Case Number: 7:2022cv01071
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Joseph Suozzo. (ok)
March 11, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Russell S. Geller served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Joseph Suozzo. (ok)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Accordingly, the action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, note service on the docket, and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/10/2022) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 10, 2022 Mailed a copy of #8 Order of Dismissal to Joseph Suozzo at 2600 Netherland Ave., Bronx, NY 10463. (kh)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Russell S. Geller, served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. Service was accepted by Russell Geller. Document filed by Joseph Suozzo. (sc)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint; served. Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc. served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. Service was accepted by Russell Geller. Document filed by Joseph Suozzo. (sc)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending #1 Complaint against Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc., Russell S. Geller with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Joseph Suozzo. Related document: #1 Complaint.(sc)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stevan Hendrik Labonte on behalf of Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc., Russell S. Geller..(Labonte, Stevan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO AMEND: The Court grants Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within 30 days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 7:22-CV-1071 (PMH). An amended complaint form is attached to this order. Defendants need not respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until the Court directs them to do so. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the Court will dismiss this action; the Court will dismiss Plaintiff's claims under federal law for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted, and the Court will decline to consider, under its supplemental jurisdiction, Plaintiff's claims under state law. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 2/11/2022) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 11, 2022 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Joseph Suozzo at 2600 Netherland Ave., Bronx, NY 10463. (dsh)
February 10, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc., Russell S. Geller. (ok)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc., Russell S. Geller. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465407018883)Document filed by Joseph Suozzo..(rdz)
February 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
February 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suozzo v. Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Suozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beck Chevrolet Co., Inc.
Represented By: Stevan Labonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell S. Geller
Represented By: Stevan Labonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?