Aviles et al v. Park Manor Acquisition II LLC et al
Plaintiff: Awilda Angeline Aviles and Awilda Aviles
Defendant: Park Manor Acquisition II LLC d/b/a Middletown Park Rehabilitation and Health Care, Michael Andrews and Park Manor Acquisition II LLC doing business as Middletown Park Rehabilitation and Health Care Center
Case Number: 7:2022cv02779
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/8/2022.(ah)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/16/2022. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (jpt)
May 4, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Andrews, Park Manor Acquisition II LLC..(McCloskey, Rebecca)
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Park Manor Acquisition II LLC..(McCloskey, Rebecca)
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Andrews served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. Service was accepted by Michael Andrews. Document filed by Awilda Aviles; Awilda Angeline Aviles..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Park Manor Acquisition II LLC served on 4/15/2022, answer due 5/6/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Awilda Aviles; Awilda Angeline Aviles..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Andrews, Park Manor Acquisition II LLC..(pc)
April 5, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Park Manor Acquisition II LLC d/b/a Middletown Park Rehabilitation and Health Care. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted; alias party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
April 5, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
April 5, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Park Manor Acquisition II LLC d/b/a Middletown Park Rehabilitation and Health Care and Michael Andrews, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Awilda Aviles, Awilda Angeline Aviles..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Andrews, Park Manor Acquisition II LLC d/b/a Middletown Park Rehabilitation and Health Care. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25959390)Document filed by Awilda Aviles, Awilda Angeline Aviles..(Taubenfeld, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviles et al v. Park Manor Acquisition II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Awilda Angeline Aviles
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Awilda Aviles
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Manor Acquisition II LLC d/b/a Middletown Park Rehabilitation and Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Andrews
Represented By: Rebecca Marie McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Manor Acquisition II LLC doing business as Middletown Park Rehabilitation and Health Care Center
Represented By: Rebecca Marie McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?