Santos v. Frankel
Plaintiff: Marcus Santos
Defendant: Bethenny Frankel
Case Number: 7:2022cv03339
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CIVIL ACTION WITH PREJUDICE UNDER FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for plaintiff Marcus Santos and counsel for defendant Bethenny Frankel that the parties have reached a settlement and that all claims asserted in the above-referenced action are dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. SO ORDERED. Bethenny Frankel terminated. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/22/2022) (vfr)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Marcus Santos..(Freeman, James)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/9/22) (yv)
November 8, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time by 30 days to re-open case or otherwise file a Stipulation of Dismissal addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from James Freeman dated 11/8/22. Document filed by Marcus Santos..(Freeman, James)
September 28, 2022 Filing 15 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/28/22 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (yv)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL... It is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within forty-five days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within forty-five days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty days day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are denied. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/28/22) (yv)
September 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/28/2022. James Freeman appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Danielle Rosenthal appeared on behalf of Defendant. No court reporter served. The Court held an initial conference. Pending further developments, the Court may hold an additional status conference to be determined. (CAM)
September 26, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Marcus Santos..(Freeman, James)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION For the week of September 26, 2022, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments in the above-numbered Action by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/23/2022) (jca)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for an initial conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wednesday, September 28, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749. Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). So Ordered. ( Initial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/24/22) (yv)
August 15, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bethenny Frankel..(Rosenthal, Danielle)
August 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Rosenthal on behalf of Bethenny Frankel..(Rosenthal, Danielle)
June 16, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bethenny Frankel waiver sent on 6/16/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Document filed by Marcus Santos..(Freeman, James)
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bethenny Frankel..(pc)
April 26, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 26, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 26, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Freeman on behalf of Marcus Santos..(Freeman, James)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bethenny Frankel, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcus Santos..(Sanders, Craig)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bethenny Frankel. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26052115)Document filed by Marcus Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph).(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Santos
Represented By: James H. Freeman
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethenny Frankel
Represented By: Danielle Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?