Fried v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Hersh Fried
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 7:2022cv04065
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Angela A. Smedley dated June 13, 2022., #1 Complaint. Wells Fargo's request for an extension is granted. Wells Fargo is directed to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before August 1, 2022. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 8/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/14/2022) (ate)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Angela A. Smedley dated June 13, 2022. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Smedley, Angela)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(pc)
May 19, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 19, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 19, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Craig Levenson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hersh Fried, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
May 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Craig Levenson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $30,000,000,000; County code Rockland; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hersh Fried..(Levenson, Scott)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26163827)Document filed by Hersh Fried..(Levenson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fried v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hersh Fried
Represented By: Scott Craig Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Angela Aziza Smedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?