Rosmarin v. Rosmarin
Plaintiff: Scott L. Rosmarin
Defendant: David A. Rosmarin
Case Number: 7:2022cv04822
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Michael Meth dated July 29, 2022 re: HIPAA Authorizations to William Lorenz, Esq.. Document filed by Scott L. Rosmarin..(Meth, Michael)
July 29, 2022 Filing 17 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Scott L. Rosmarin..(Meth, Michael)
July 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 7/28/2022. Plaintiff's counsel Michael Meth, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel William Lorenz, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Jane Ramage appears telephonically. Case Management Plan signed. The Court schedules the next status conference for February 28, 2023 at 11:45 a.m. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by February 14, 2023; opposition due February 21, 2023. This proceeding was recorded via the AT&T Teleconference platform. (Status Conference set for 2/28/2023 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (wc)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any pre-motion conference in connection with a motion to amend or join additional parties must be requested by 9/8/22. Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2023. Depositions of fact witnesses disclosed in the parties initial disclosures are to be completed by 12/15/22. All expert discovery is to be completed by 2/15/23. Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2023 at 11:45 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/28/2022) (rro) Modified on 8/4/2022 (rro).
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by David A. Rosmarin..(Schechter, Joel)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by David A. Rosmarin..(Schechter, Joel)
July 13, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Arcona Lorenz, Jr on behalf of David A. Rosmarin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service).(Lorenz, William)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Notice is hereby given that, subject to approval by the court, David A. Rosmarin, substitutes Joel B. Schechter, Esq., as counsel of record in place of Glenn Monk, Esq. and Marc J. Kuzman, Esq. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. Attorney Joel B Schechter for David A. Rosmarin added. Attorney Glenn A. Monk; Adam Glenn Greenberg and Marc J. Kurzman terminated. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/12/2022) (mml)
July 12, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by David A. Rosmarin..(Schechter, Joel)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Telephonic Initial Conference adjourned to 7/28/22 at 3:30 pm. The parties should submit a proposed scheduling order in advance. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
July 11, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Conference on July 14, 2022 at 10:30 am addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Glenn A. Monk, Esq. dated 07/11/2022. Document filed by David A. Rosmarin..(Monk, Glenn)
June 30, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David A. Rosmarin.Document filed by Scott L. Rosmarin..(Meth, Michael)
June 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael David Meth on behalf of Scott L. Rosmarin..(Meth, Michael)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Glenn Greenberg on behalf of David A. Rosmarin..(Greenberg, Adam)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall appear in a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on July 14, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. (via telephone). Person(s) appearing via telephone are reminded of the general prohibition against any forms of recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on July 29, 2021, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. The parties should call in from a landline phone (if possible), announce their last name(s) before addressing the Court at any time during the call, and mute their lines (pressing *6 on phone) when not speaking. Initial Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Verified Answer to Verified Complaint served on Michael D. Meth, Esq. for Pltf. Scott L. Rosmarin on 06-16-2022. Document filed by David A. Rosmarin..(Monk, Glenn)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by David A. Rosmarin..(Monk, Glenn)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kurzman, Marc)
June 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc J. Kurzman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $2,000,000,000; County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
June 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Marc J. Kurzman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
June 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc J. Kurzman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Scott L. Rosmarin, David A. Rosmarin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
June 10, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 10, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, State of New York, County of Orange. Case Number: EF002809-2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26261067).Document filed by David A. Rosmarin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Kurzman, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosmarin v. Rosmarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott L. Rosmarin
Represented By: Michael David Meth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Rosmarin
Represented By: Marc J. Kurzman
Represented By: Adam Glenn Greenberg
Represented By: Glenn A. Monk
Represented By: Joel B Schechter
Represented By: William Arcona Lorenz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?