The ProImmune Company, LLC v. Lile et al
Plaintiff: The ProImmune Company, LLC
Defendant: M.D Laura Lile and Three Aminos, LLC
Counter Claimant: Laura Lile
3Rd Party Defendant: Albert M.D. Crum
Case Number: 7:2022cv07242
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Referring Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (62 in 7:22-cv-08227-KMK) Letter filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC, (49 in 7:22-cv-08229-KMK) Letter filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC, Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC, (59 in 7:22-cv-07242-KMK) Letter filed by Albert M.D. Crum, The ProImmune Company, LLC. ENDORSEMENT The briefing schedule is approved and the Court grants the application to stay the Rule 26 reports until further order of the Court. So Ordered. (Motions due by 10/27/2023., Replies due by 12/1/2023., Responses due by 11/17/2023) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/20/2023) (jca)
September 20, 2023 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 9/20/2023 re: Court's September 6, 2023 Order. Document filed by Albert M.D. Crum, The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, Pursuant to the Local Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, Defendants/Counterclaimants hereby agree that Natraj Bhushan, Esq. of Turturro Law, P.C., be substituted as counsel in the place and stead of Frank Spano, Jay Heidrick, and Joshua Rayes of Polsinelli PC (LLP in California) in the above-entitled action. Consent of both withdrawing and substituting attorneys is indicated below along with the signature of the respective clients. Polsinelli PC hereby consents to the substitution of Turturro Law, P.C. as attorneys of record for Defendants/Counterclaimants Laura Lile, M.D., and Tbree Aminos, LLC. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Attorney Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC added. Attorney Joshua Louis Rayes; Frank Thomas Spano; Jay E. Heidrick and Carter Kristek terminated.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/6/23) (yv)
September 6, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Status Conference held on 9/6/2023. Ryan Abbott appeared for Plaintiff. Natraj Bhushan appeared on behalf of Defendants. Sue Ghorayeb served as court reporter. Plaintiff will submit a letter to the Court by September 20, 2023 providing an update as to the status of any outstanding disputes between the Parties and the need to reopen the pending cases. Defendants' response, if any, will be due October 4, 2023. (RDK)
September 5, 2023 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated September 5, 2023 re: Status Update Prior to September 6, 2023 Status Conference. Document filed by Albert M.D. Crum, The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Agreed Order Resolving Motion to Enforce Automatic Stay and for Contempt).(Abbott, Ryan)
July 21, 2023 Filing 56 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #55 Letter filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a status conference on September 6, 2023 at 2:30 PM. The Clerk of Court is directed to file this letter in all related dockets. ( Status Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/21/2023) (ate)
July 21, 2023 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan B. Abbott dated 7/21/2023 re: Response to ECF 54. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
June 30, 2023 Filing 54 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Natraj Bhushan dated June 30, 2023 re: Letter Response to Plaintiff's Application to Reopen. Document filed by Laura Lile(M.D.), Three Aminos, LLC..(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 28, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Frank Spano, New Attorney: Natraj S Bhushan, Address: Turturro Law PC, 1361 North Railroad Avenue, Staten Island, NY, United States 10306, 7183842323. Document filed by Laura Lile(M.D.), Three Aminos, LLC..(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 27, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION to Reopen Case Application to Reopen Case. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Barnes, Rowennakete)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within sixty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same sixty days day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are denied. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/03/2023) (ama)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Letter Motion to Stay re: #49 FIFTH LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines including the deadline to file Rule 26(f) report for 60 days addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated May 1, 2023. Granted. So Ordered. (yv)
May 1, 2023 Filing 49 FIFTH LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines including the deadline to file Rule 26(f) report for 60 days addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated May 1, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile(M.D.)..(Spano, Frank)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/3/23) (yv)
April 3, 2023 Filing 47 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Rule 26(f) Case Management and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 4/3/2023. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
March 17, 2023 Filing 46 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated March 17, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/16/23) (yv)
February 16, 2023 Filing 44 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Rule 26(f) report addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated February 16, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile(M.D.), Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Both requests are granted. The pre-motion conference will be adjourned until after the submission of the Rule 26 report, which may be filed by 2/17/23. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/5/2023) (vfr)
January 5, 2023 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for January 17, 2023 addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated January 5, 2023. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC. Return Date set for 1/17/2023 at 12:00 PM..(Spano, Frank)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE RESCHEDULING CONFERENCE The teleconference scheduled for Thursday, January 12, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled for Tuesday, January 17, 2023 at 12:00 p.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/4/2023) (jca)
December 29, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Louis Rayes on behalf of Laura Lile(M.D.), Three Aminos, LLC..(Rayes, Joshua)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/29/2022) (vfr)
December 29, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 28, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua L. Rayes in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Rayes, Joshua)
December 21, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay E. Heidrick on behalf of Laura Lile(M.D.), Three Aminos, LLC..(Heidrick, Jay)
December 21, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carter Kristek on behalf of Laura Lile(M.D.), Three Aminos, LLC..(Kristek, Carter)
December 20, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Laura Lile(M.D.), Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
December 20, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Laura Lile(M.D.), Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
December 19, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #31 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27099188. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California 415-865-7000. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
December 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #30 Motion for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having considered the Motion and the Affidavit of Carter T. Kristek, and being fully advised in the premises, finds the Motion should be GRANTED. THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Carter T. Kristek is admitted to appear pro hac vice as counsel in the above-captioned matter for Defendants Laura Lile, M.D. and Three Aminos, LLC. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/16/22) (yv)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #29 Motion for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/16/2022) (vfr)
December 16, 2022 Filing 31 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27099188. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua L. Rayes in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Rayes, Joshua) Modified on 12/19/2022 (sgz).
December 16, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 16, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095445. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 15, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095445. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carter T. Kristek in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Kristek, Carter)
December 15, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jay E. Heidrick in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Heidrick, Jay)
December 15, 2022 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Albert M.D. Crum waiver sent on 11/20/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC; Laura Lile..(Heidrick, Jay)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: granting #26 Letter Motion for Conference re: #26 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #25 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #24 Letter in response to pre-motion conference requesting dismissal of counterclaims. addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated December 7, 2022. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on 1/12/2023 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED., Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/13/2022) (ama)
December 7, 2022 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #25 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #24 Letter in response to pre-motion conference requesting dismissal of counterclaims addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated December 7, 2022., #24 Letter addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated December 7, 2022. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Initial Disclosures 22-cv-7242, #2 Exhibit 2-Initial Disclosures 22-8227, #3 Exhibit 3-Initial Disclosures 22-8229).(Spano, Frank)
December 7, 2022 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #24 Letter in response to pre-motion conference requesting dismissal of counterclaims addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated December 7, 2022. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
November 30, 2022 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 11/30/2022 re: Pre-Motion Conference Request re Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
November 17, 2022 Filing 23 AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against The ProImmune Company, LLC. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC, Laura Lile(M.D.)..(Spano, Frank)
November 16, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to., COUNTERCLAIM against The ProImmune Company, LLC. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
October 31, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against The ProImmune Company, LLC. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC, Laura Lile..(Spano, Frank)
September 26, 2022 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE of Notice of Removal. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Statement of Relatedness, #3 Supplement Rule 7.1 Statement).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/30/2022 (lb).
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #18 Motion for Thomas C. Rickeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/26/2022) (ama)
September 26, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Thomas C. Rickeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 23, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Thomas C. Rickeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Rickeman, Tom) Modified on 9/26/2022 (aea).
September 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #17 MOTION for Thomas C. Rickeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26650068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit Not Notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
September 8, 2022 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas C. Rickeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26650068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Rickeman, Tom) Modified on 9/9/2022 (sgz).
September 6, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
September 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so redesignated. (vba)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Accordingly, the case will be reassigned to White Plains. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/2/2022) (ate) Modified on 9/6/2022 (ate).
September 1, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Three Aminos, LLC waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
September 1, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Laura Lile waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
August 30, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Ryan Abbott dated August 30, 2022 re: Response to Defendants' Request for Re-Assignment to White Plains. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
August 29, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Frank T. Spano dated August 29, 2022 re: Request for Re-Assignment to White Plains Courthouse. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
August 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
August 29, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
August 26, 2022 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf)
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rowennakete Paul Barnes on behalf of The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
August 25, 2022 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Abbott, Ryan)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC..(pc)
August 25, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Abbott, Ryan) Modified on 8/25/2022 (pc).
August 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT TRADEMARK FORM. Notice to Attorney Ryan Benjamin Abbott to RE-FILE Document No. #5 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; Remove the Notice of Mailing page from the AO 120 Form.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (pc)
August 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ryan Benjamin Abbott. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank; Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
August 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 24, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LAURA LILE; THREE AMINOS, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
August 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Abbott, Ryan)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26592052)Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Distribution Agreeement, #2 Exhibit 2- Second Amendment to Distribution Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Trademark Registration).(Abbott, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The ProImmune Company, LLC v. Lile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The ProImmune Company, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Benjamin Abbott
Represented By: Rowennakete Paul Barnes
Represented By: Tom Rickeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D Laura Lile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Aminos, LLC
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Represented By: Carter Kristek
Represented By: Jay E. Heidrick
Represented By: Joshua Louis Rayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Laura Lile
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Represented By: Jay E. Heidrick
Represented By: Carter Kristek
Represented By: Joshua Louis Rayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Albert M.D. Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?