The ProImmune Company, LLC v. Lile et al
Plaintiff: The ProImmune Company, LLC
Defendant: M.D. Laura Lile and Three Aminos, LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Albert M.D. Crum
Counter Defendant: Albert Crum, M.D. and Laura Lile, M.D.
Case Number: 7:2022cv08227
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Filing 76 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #70 MOTION to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D...(Bhushan, Natraj)
November 17, 2023 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #73 FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D.. . Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 30, 2023 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Natraj Bhushan in Support re: #73 FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D... Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D...(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 30, 2023 Filing 73 FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D.. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D...(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 30, 2023 Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. Related Document Number: #70 ..(Abbott, Ryan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 30, 2023 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #70 MOTION to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 30, 2023 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Patent No. RE42,645, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Patent No. RE39, 734, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Patent No. 9,229,014).(Abbott, Ryan)
October 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Natraj Bhushan to RE-FILE Document #69 FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D... ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (Supporting Documents are found under the Event Type - Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents;. (kj)
October 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ryan Abbott to RE-FILE Document #68 MOTION to Dismiss - Plaintiffs The ProImmune Company, LLC and Albert Crum, M.D.s Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims.. Use the event type Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents found under the event list Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ***REMINDER***MOTION WAS NOT FILED. FIRST FILE THE MOTION, THEN LINK THE SUPPORTING DOCUMENT(S) TO THE MOTION.*** (kj)
October 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #72 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
October 27, 2023 Filing 69 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D.. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support).(Bhushan, Natraj) Modified on 10/30/2023 (kj).
October 25, 2023 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss - Plaintiffs The ProImmune Company, LLC and Albert Crum, M.D.s Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order re: Plaintiffs The ProImmune Company, LLC and Albert Crum, M.D.s Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims).(Abbott, Ryan)
October 25, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #54 Motion to Reopen Case. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's application to reopen the case is granted. In granting this application, the Court expresses no view on the question whether the automatic bankruptcy stay should apply to Defendant Laura Lile. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion. (See Dkt. No. 54.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/17/23) (yv)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (62 in 7:22-cv-07242-KMK) Letter Clarification of Representation filed by Three Aminos, LLC, (64 in 7:22-cv-08227-KMK) Letter Clarification of Representation filed by Three Aminos, LLC, (51 in 7:22-cv-08229-KMK) Letter Clarification of Representation filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks counsel for clarifying the representation issues in this case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/5/23) (yv)
October 5, 2023 Filing 64 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Natraj Bhushan dated 10/05/2023 re: Clarification of Representation. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC..(Bhushan, Natraj)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (62 in 7:22-cv-08227-KMK) Letter filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC, (49 in 7:22-cv-08229-KMK) Letter filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC, Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC, (59 in 7:22-cv-07242-KMK) Letter filed by Albert M.D. Crum, The ProImmune Company, LLC. ENDORSEMENT The briefing schedule is approved and the Court grants the application to stay the Rule 26 reports until further order of the Court. So Ordered. (Motions due by 10/27/2023., Replies due by 12/1/2023., Responses due by 11/17/2023) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/20/2023) (jca)
September 20, 2023 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 9/20/2023 re: Court's September 6, 2023 Order. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL: Pursuant to the Local Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, Defendants/Counterclaimants hereby agree that Natraj Bhushan, Esq. of Turturro Law, P.C., be substituted as counsel in the place and stead of Frank Spano, Jay Heidrick, and Joshua Rayes of Polsinelli PC (LLP in California) in the above-entitled action. Consent of both withdrawing and substituting attorneys is indicated below along with the signature of the respective clients. Polsinelli PC hereby consents to the substitution of Turturro Law, P.C. as attorneys of record for Defendants/Counterclaimants Laura Lile, M.D., and Three Aminos, LLC. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC added. Attorney Frank Thomas Spano; Jay E. Heidrick and Joshua Louis Rayes terminated. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/6/2023) (tg)
September 6, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Status Conference held on 9/6/2023. Ryan Abbott appeared for Plaintiff. Natraj Bhushan appeared on behalf of Defendants. Sue Ghorayeb served as court reporter. Plaintiff will submit a letter to the Court by September 20, 2023 providing an update as to the status of any outstanding disputes between the Parties and the need to reopen the pending cases. Defendants' response, if any, will be due October 4, 2023. (RDK)
September 5, 2023 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated September 5, 2023 re: Status Update Prior to September 6, 2023 Status Conference. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order Resolving Motion to Enforce Automatic Stay and for Contempt).(Abbott, Ryan)
September 5, 2023 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated September 5, 2023 re: Status Update Prior to September 6, 2023 Status Conference. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order Resolving Motion to Enforce Automatic Stay and for Contempt).(Abbott, Ryan)
July 21, 2023 Filing 58 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #57 Letter filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a status conference on September 6, 2023 at 2:30 PM. The Clerk of Court is directed to file this letter in all related dockets. ( Status Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/21/2023) (ate)
July 21, 2023 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan B. Abbott dated 7/21/2023 re: Response to ECF 56. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
June 30, 2023 Filing 56 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Natraj Bhushan dated June 30, 2023 re: Letter Response to Plaintiff's Application to Reopen. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 28, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Frank Spano, New Attorney: Natraj S Bhushan, Address: Turturro Law PC, 1361 North Railroad Avenue, Staten Island, NY, United States 10306, 718-384-2323. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 27, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION to Reopen Case Application to Reopen Case. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Barnes, Rowennakete)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within sixty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same sixty days day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are denied. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/03/2023) (ama)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Letter Motion to Stay re: #51 FIFTH LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines including the deadline to file Rule 26(f) report for 60 days addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated May 1, 2023. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/1/23) (yv)
May 1, 2023 Filing 51 FIFTH LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines including the deadline to file Rule 26(f) report for 60 days addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated May 1, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/3/23) (yv)
April 3, 2023 Filing 49 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Rule 26(f) Case Management and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 4/3/2023. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
March 17, 2023 Filing 48 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated March 17, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/16/23) (yv)
February 16, 2023 Filing 46 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Rule 26(f) report. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Both requests are granted. The pre-motion conference will be adjourned until after the submission of the Rule 26 report, which may be filed by 2/17/23. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/5/2023) (vfr)
January 5, 2023 Filing 44 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for January 17, 2023 addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated January 5, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. Return Date set for 1/17/2023 at 12:00 PM..(Spano, Frank)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE RESCHEDULING CONFERENCE The teleconference scheduled for Thursday, January 12, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled for Tuesday, January 17, 2023 at 12:00 p.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/4/2023) (jca)
December 29, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Louis Rayes on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Rayes, Joshua)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #40 Motion for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/29/2022) (vfr)
December 29, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 28, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua L. Rayes in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Rayes, Joshua)
December 21, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay E. Heidrick on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Heidrick, Jay)
December 21, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carter Kristek on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Kristek, Carter)
December 20, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
December 20, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
December 19, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #33 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27099239. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California 415-865-7000. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/16/2022) (vfr)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #31 Motion for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/16/2022) (vfr)
December 16, 2022 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27099239. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua L. Rayes in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Rayes, Joshua) Modified on 12/19/2022 (sgz).
December 16, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095467. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 16, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095398. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 15, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095467. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carter T. Kristek in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Kristek, Carter)
December 15, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095398. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jay E. Heidrick in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Heidrick, Jay)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #29 Letter Response to ProImmune Pre-Motion Letter - Non-Derivative Suit., filed by Three Aminos, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on 1/12/2023 at 03:00. So Ordered., ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/12/22) (yv)
December 12, 2022 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated December 12, 2022 re: Response to ProImmune Pre-Motion Letter - Non-Derivative Suit. Document filed by Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit 2 Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3 Initial Disclosures).(Spano, Frank)
December 6, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Benjamin Abbott on behalf of Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
December 5, 2022 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 12/5/2022 re: Pre-Motion Conference Request re Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
November 17, 2022 Filing 26 AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D...(Spano, Frank)
November 16, 2022 Filing 25 AMENDED ANSWER to., COUNTERCLAIM against Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS:WHEREAS, the parties agree to extend the ProImmune Parties deadline to respond to the Counterclaims to December 5, 2022. SO ORDERED. The ProImmune Company, LLC answer due 12/5/2022. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/24/2022) (rro)
October 21, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:22-cv-07242-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
October 21, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 21, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
October 12, 2022 Filing 23 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
October 3, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Laura Lile, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
September 28, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal supporting papers served on The Proimmune Company; Albert Crum,MD on 9/27/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
September 28, 2022 Filing 20 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-07242. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
September 28, 2022 Filing 19 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spano, Frank)
September 28, 2022 Filing 18 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
September 28, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 653092-2022..Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Notice of Commencement, #6 Exhibit Summons, #7 Exhibit Docket Sheet State Court, #8 Exhibit Stipulation Time to Answer).(Spano, Frank)
September 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frank Thomas Spano. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
September 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Frank Thomas Spano to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; PDF should consist of Civil Cover Sheet ONLY; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
September 28, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #13 Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-26738696, paid on 9/27/2022. (sj)
September 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Frank Thomas Spano to RE-FILE Document No. #15 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the corporate disclosure statement is not correct; PDF should consist of Rule 7.1 Statement ONLY; the wrong event type was used to file the corporate disclosure statement. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (sj)
September 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
September 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Frank Thomas Spano to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; PDF should consist of Related Case Statement ONLY; the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
September 28, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 7:22cv7242. (sj)
September 27, 2022 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 653092-2022..Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Related Case Affirmation).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/28/2022 (sj).
September 27, 2022 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 653092-2022..Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rule 7.1 Statement).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/28/2022 (sj).
September 27, 2022 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 653092/2022..Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/28/2022 (sj).
September 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 653092-2022..Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Part 1 of 7, #2 Exhibit Complaint Part 2 of 7, #3 Exhibit Complaint Part 3 of 7, #4 Exhibit Complaint Part 4 of 7, #5 Exhibit Complaint Part 5 of 7, #6 Exhibit Complaint Part 6 of 7, #7 Exhibit Complaint Part 7 of 7, #8 Exhibit Notice of Commencement, #9 Errata Summons, #10 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #11 Exhibit Stipulation).(Spano, Frank)
September 27, 2022 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #9 Notice (Other), #10 Notice (Other), #7 Notice (Other), #5 Notice (Other), #11 Notice (Other), #1 Notice (Other), #6 Notice (Other), #8 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Frank Thomas Spano. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
September 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Frank Thomas Spano to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Notice (Other), #12 Notice (Other), #2 Notice (Other), #1 Notice (Other), #9 Notice (Other), #6 Notice (Other), #8 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other), #10 Notice (Other), #7 Notice (Other), #5 Notice (Other), #11 Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; Pursuant to ECF Rule 13.3, you must refile your pleading with exhibits named accordingly. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 10/3/2022. (vf)
September 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frank Thomas Spano. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Dollar Demand 75,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 75,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (vf)
September 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Frank Thomas Spano, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
September 26, 2022 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Statement of Relatedness, #3 Supplement Rule 7.1 Statement).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Commencement, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Stipulation Extending Time).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice (Other). Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).
September 26, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Removal. Document filed by Laura Lile, Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank) Modified on 9/27/2022 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The ProImmune Company, LLC v. Lile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Albert M.D. Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The ProImmune Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Laura Lile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Aminos, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Albert Crum, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Laura Lile, M.D.
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Represented By: Natraj Bhushan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?