The ProImmune Company, LLC et al v. Laura Lile, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: The ProImmune Company, LLC, Stress Watchers Oxidative Stress Test Method LLC and Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC
Counter Claimant: Laura Lile, M.D. and Three Aminos, LLC
Counter Defendant: Albert Crum, M.D.
Case Number: 7:2022cv08229
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 bc Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Filing 63 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #57 MOTION to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims and Cross-Claims. . Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D...(Bhushan, Natraj)
November 17, 2023 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #60 FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D.. . Document filed by Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC, The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 30, 2023 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Natraj Bhushan in Support re: #60 FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D... Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D...(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 30, 2023 Filing 60 FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D.. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D...(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 30, 2023 Filing 59 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Patent No. RE42,645, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Patent No. RE39, 734, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Patent No. 9,229,014) Related Document Number: #57 ..(Abbott, Ryan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 30, 2023 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #57 MOTION to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims and Cross-Claims. . Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 30, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims and Cross-Claims. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ryan Benjamin Abbott to RE-FILE Document #55 MOTION to Dismiss - Plaintiff The ProImmune Company, LLC and Third-Party Defendant Albert Crum, M.D.s Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims and Cross-Claims.. Use the event type Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents found under the event list Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ***REMINDER***MOTION WAS NOT FILED. FIRST FILE THE MOTION, THEN LINK THE SUPPORTING DOCUMENT(S) TO THE MOTION.*** (kj)
October 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Natraj Bhushan to RE-FILE Document #56 FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D... ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (Supporting Documents are found under the Event Type - Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents;. (kj)
October 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #59 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
October 27, 2023 Filing 56 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Stay Claims/Case As Against Laura Lile, M.D.. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support).(Bhushan, Natraj) Modified on 10/30/2023 (kj).
October 25, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss - Plaintiff The ProImmune Company, LLC and Third-Party Defendant Albert Crum, M.D.s Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims and Cross-Claims. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles Counterclaims and Cross-Claims, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order re: Plaintiff The ProImmune Company, LLC and Third-Party Defendant Albert Crum, M.D.s Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims and Cross-Claims).(Abbott, Ryan)
October 25, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Laura Liles First Amended Counterclaims and Cross-Claims. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Motion to Reopen Case. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's application to reopen the case is granted. In granting this application, the Court expresses no view on the question whether the automatic bankruptcy stay should apply to Defendant Laura Lile. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion. (See Dkt. No. 42.)SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/17/23) (yv)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (62 in 7:22-cv-07242-KMK) Letter Clarification of Representation filed by Three Aminos, LLC, (64 in 7:22-cv-08227-KMK) Letter Clarification of Representation filed by Three Aminos, LLC, (51 in 7:22-cv-08229-KMK) Letter Clarification of Representation filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks counsel for clarifying the representation issues in this case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/5/23) (yv)
October 5, 2023 Filing 51 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Natraj Bhushan dated 10/5/2023 re: Letter Clarifying Representation. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Bhushan, Natraj)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (62 in 7:22-cv-08227-KMK) Letter filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC, (49 in 7:22-cv-08229-KMK) Letter filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC, Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC, (59 in 7:22-cv-07242-KMK) Letter filed by Albert M.D. Crum, The ProImmune Company, LLC. ENDORSEMENT The briefing schedule is approved and the Court grants the application to stay the Rule 26 reports until further order of the Court. So Ordered. (Motions due by 10/27/2023., Replies due by 12/1/2023., Responses due by 11/17/2023) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/20/2023) (jca)
September 20, 2023 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 9/20/2023 re: Court's September 6, 2023 Order. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC, The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL: Pursuant to the Local Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, Defendants/Counterclaimants hereby agree that Natraj Bhushan, Esq. of Turturro Law, P.C., be substituted as counsel in the place and stead of Frank Spano, Jay Heidrick, and Joshua Rayes of Polsinelli PC (LLP in California) in the above-entitled action. Consent of both withdrawing and substituting attorneys is indicated below along with the signature of the respective clients. Polsinelli PC hereby consents to the substitution of Turturro Law, P.C. as attorneys of record for Defendants/Counterclaimants Laura Lile, M.D., and Three Aminos, LLC. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Laura Lile, M.D.,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC,Natraj Bhushan for Three Aminos, LLC added. Attorney Frank Thomas Spano; Jay E. Heidrick and Joshua Louis Rayes terminated. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/6/2023) (tg)
September 6, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Status Conference held on 9/6/2023. Ryan Abbott appeared for Plaintiff. Natraj Bhushan appeared on behalf of Defendants. Sue Ghorayeb served as court reporter. Plaintiff will submit a letter to the Court by September 20, 2023 providing an update as to the status of any outstanding disputes between the Parties and the need to reopen the pending cases. Defendants' response, if any, will be due October 4, 2023. (RDK)
September 5, 2023 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated September 5, 2023 re: Status Update Prior to September 6, 2023 Status Conference. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order Resolving Motion to Enforce Automatic Stay and for Contempt).(Abbott, Ryan)
July 21, 2023 Filing 46 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #45 Letter filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC, Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a status conference on September 6, 2023 at 2:30 PM. The Clerk of Court is directed to file this letter in all related dockets. ( Status Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/21/2023) (ate)
July 21, 2023 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan B. Abbott dated 7/21/2023 re: Response to ECF 44. Document filed by Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC, The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
June 30, 2023 Filing 44 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Natraj Bhushan dated June 30, 2023 re: Letter Response to Plaintiff's Application to Reopen. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 28, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Frank Spano, New Attorney: Natraj S Bhushan, Address: Turturro Law PC, 1361 North Railroad Avenue, Staten Island, NY, United States 10306, 7183842323. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 27, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION to Reopen Case Application to Reopen Case. Document filed by Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC, The ProImmune Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Barnes, Rowennakete)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within sixty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same sixty days day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are denied. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/03/2023) (ama)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Letter Motion to Stay re: #39 FIFTH LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines including the deadline to file Rule 26(f) report for 60 days addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated May 1, 2023. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/1/23) (yv)
May 1, 2023 Filing 39 FIFTH LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines including the deadline to file Rule 26(f) report for 60 days addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated May 1, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/3/23) (yv)
April 3, 2023 Filing 37 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Rule 26(f) Case Management and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 4/3/2023. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
March 17, 2023 Filing 36 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated March 17, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/16/23) (yv)
February 16, 2023 Filing 34 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Rule 26(f) report addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Both requests are granted. The pre-motion conference will be adjourned until after the submission of the Rule 26 report, which may be filed by 2/17/23. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/5/2023) (vfr)
January 5, 2023 Filing 32 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for January 17, 2023 addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated January 5, 2023. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. Return Date set for 1/17/2023 at 12:00 PM..(Spano, Frank)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE RESCHEDULING CONFERENCE The teleconference scheduled for Thursday, January 12, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled for Tuesday, January 17, 2023 at 12:00 p.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/4/2023) (jca)
December 29, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Louis Rayes on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Rayes, Joshua)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #28 Motion for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/29/2022) (vfr)
December 29, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 28, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua L. Rayes in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Rayes, Joshua)
December 21, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay E. Heidrick on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Heidrick, Jay)
December 21, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carter Kristek on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Kristek, Carter)
December 20, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
December 20, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
December 19, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #21 MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27099293. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California 415-865-7000. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #20 Motion for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/16/2022) (vfr)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/16/2022) (vfr)
December 16, 2022 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua L. Rayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27099293. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua L. Rayes in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Rayes, Joshua) Modified on 12/19/2022 (sgz).
December 16, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095490. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 16, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095422. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 15, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Carter T. Kristek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095490. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carter T. Kristek in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Kristek, Carter)
December 15, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Jay E. Heidrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27095422. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jay E. Heidrick in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice).(Heidrick, Jay)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Letter Response to ProImmune Pre-Motion Letter, filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a Pre-Motion Conference set on 1/12/2023 at 03:00 PM. SO ORDERED., ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/13/22) (yv)
December 12, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated December 12, 2022 re: Response to ProImmune Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit 2 Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3 Initial Disclosures).(Spano, Frank)
December 5, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 12/5/2022 re: Pre-Motion Conference Request re Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
November 17, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Albert Crum, M.D.., COUNTERCLAIM against The ProImmune Company, LLC. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
November 16, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to., CROSSCLAIM against Albert Crum, M.D.., COUNTERCLAIM against Albert Crum, M.D.. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2022. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/2/2022) (tg)
November 2, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for defendants to amend their pleadings addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Frank Spano dated November 2, 2022. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
October 26, 2022 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Ryan Abbott dated 10/26/2022 re: Pre-Motion Conference Request re Motion to Dismiss and Remand. Document filed by Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rowennakete Paul Barnes on behalf of Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
October 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Benjamin Abbott on behalf of Albert Crum, M.D., The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Abbott, Ryan)
October 14, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION RE: RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. The parties agree to extend Prolmmune's deadline to respond to the Counterclaims to December 5, 2022; SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/12/22) (yv)
October 12, 2022 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The ProImmune Company, LLC..(Barnes, Rowennakete)
October 4, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal (Doc. No. 1) served on Plaintiffs on September 27, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
September 30, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - CASE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Frank Thomas Spano to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Notice of Removal belonging to case 1:22-cv-8227 that was incorrectly filed in case 1:22-cv-8229. (gp)
September 30, 2022 FEE PAID IN ERORR $402.00 Receipt # ANYSDC-26737611 on 9/27/2022. Doc #5 filed in the wrong case..(gp)
September 29, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
September 29, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
September 29, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:22-cv-07242-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
September 27, 2022 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #5 Notice of Removal. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (gp)
September 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Frank Thomas Spano re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf)
September 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frank Thomas Spano. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand Blank; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 75,000; the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (vf)
September 27, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
September 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frank Thomas Spano. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The ProImmune Company, LLC, Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
September 27, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 27, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 7:22-cv-07242. (vf)
September 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Frank Thomas Spano. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Stress Watchers Oxidative Stress Test Method LLC. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Frank Spano re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-07242 (KMK). Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC..(Spano, Frank)
September 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spano, Frank)
September 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653093/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26735284).Document filed by Laura Lile, M.D., Three Aminos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint (Part 4 of 4), #5 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Commencement, #6 Exhibit 3 - Original Summons, #7 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit 5 - Stipulation, #9 Exhibit 6 - Answer with Counterclaims, #10 Exhibit 7 - Verification).(Spano, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The ProImmune Company, LLC et al v. Laura Lile, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The ProImmune Company, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Benjamin Abbott
Represented By: Rowennakete Paul Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stress Watchers Oxidative Stress Test Method LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innate FFAAP Medicine LLC
Represented By: Rowennakete Paul Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Laura Lile, M.D.
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Represented By: Carter Kristek
Represented By: Jay E. Heidrick
Represented By: Joshua Louis Rayes
Represented By: Natraj Bhushan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Three Aminos, LLC
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Represented By: Carter Kristek
Represented By: Jay E. Heidrick
Represented By: Joshua Louis Rayes
Represented By: Natraj Bhushan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Albert Crum, M.D.
Represented By: Ryan Benjamin Abbott
Represented By: Rowennakete Paul Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?