Pimental v. Dylan Joseph Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: EMIL ZAPATA PIMENTEL and Emil M. Zapata Pimental
Defendant: DYLAN JOSEPH MOTORS LLC dba ALFA ROMEO MASERATI OF MANHATTAN, Bank of America N.A. and Dylan Joseph Motors LLC doing business as Alfa Romeo Maserati of Manhattan
Case Number: 7:2022cv08908
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Shan P. Massand dated December 14, 2022., #1 Complaint,. Granted. So Ordered. Bank of America N.A. answer due 1/6/2023. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/14/2022) (ate)
December 14, 2022 Filing 19 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Shan P. Massand dated December 14, 2022. Document filed by Bank of America N.A...(Massand, Shan)
December 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/6/2023. (ate)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Scott H. Mandel dated November 30, 2022., #5 Complaint. Granted. So Ordered. (Dylan Joseph Motors LLC answer due 12/22/2022.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/30/22) (yv)
November 30, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Howard Mandel on behalf of Dylan Joseph Motors LLC..(Mandel, Scott)
November 30, 2022 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Scott H. Mandel dated November 30, 2022. Document filed by Dylan Joseph Motors LLC..(Mandel, Scott)
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Dylan Joseph Motors LLC served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. Service was accepted by Secretary of State,. Document filed by Emil M. Zapata Pimental..(Nahoum, Robert)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Shan P. Massand dated November 18, 2022., #13 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Shan P. Massand dated November 18, 2022., #5 Complaint. Bank of America N.A. answer due 12/16/2022; granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Shan P. Massand dated November 18, 2022., #13 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Shan P. Massand dated November 18, 2022., #5 Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Bank of America N.A. answer due 12/16/2022.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/18/22) (yv)
November 18, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Shan P. Massand dated November 18, 2022. Document filed by Bank of America N.A...(Massand, Shan)
November 18, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Shan P. Massand dated November 18, 2022. Document filed by Bank of America N.A...(Massand, Shan)
November 18, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shan P. Massand on behalf of Bank of America N.A...(Massand, Shan)
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of America N.A.. (vf)
October 21, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 20, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America, N.A., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Emil M. Zapata Pimental..(Nahoum, Robert)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dylan Joseph Motors LLC..(pc)
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dylan Joseph Motors LLC dba Alfa Romeo Maserati of Manhattan, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Emil M. Zapata Pimental..(Nahoum, Robert)
October 20, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Emil M. Zapata Pimental..(Nahoum, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2022 (pc).
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Bank of America N.A., Dylan Joseph Motors LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26845032)Document filed by Emil M. Zapata Pimental..(Nahoum, Robert)
October 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert J. Nahoum to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name listed on the docket entry does not exactly match;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert J. Nahoum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: EMIL ZAPATA PIMENTEL, DYLAN JOSEPH MOTORS LLC dba ALFA ROMEO MASERATI OF MANHATTAN. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
October 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert J. Nahoum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Rockland;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (pc)
October 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert J. Nahoum to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert J. Nahoum to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Caption title does not list the document being filed (Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 10/25/2022. (pc)
October 20, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 20, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 20, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 19, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dylan Joseph Motors LLC dba Alfa Romeo Maserati of Manhattan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by EMIL ZAPATA PIMENTEL..(Nahoum, Robert)
October 19, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by EMIL ZAPATA PIMENTEL..(Nahoum, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2022 (pc).
October 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nahoum, Robert)
October 19, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Bank of America N.A., DYLAN JOSEPH MOTORS LLC dba ALFA ROMEO MASERATI OF MANHATTAN. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26836962)Document filed by EMIL ZAPATA PIMENTEL..(Nahoum, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pimental v. Dylan Joseph Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMIL ZAPATA PIMENTEL
Represented By: Robert J. Nahoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil M. Zapata Pimental
Represented By: Robert J. Nahoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYLAN JOSEPH MOTORS LLC dba ALFA ROMEO MASERATI OF MANHATTAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Joseph Motors LLC doing business as Alfa Romeo Maserati of Manhattan
Represented By: Scott Howard Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?