Castelan v. John et al
Plaintiff: Christian Castelan
Defendant: Correctional Officer Keenan A. John, Correctional Officer Shaun H. Kerr and A-Block Sergeant Bermann Joseph
Case Number: 7:2022cv09326
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Christian Castelan, 19-A-4453, at Sing Sing Correctional Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562, on 11/30/2022 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Correctional Officer Keenan A. John, Correctional Sergeant Bermann Joseph, Correctional Officer Shaun H. Kerr. (sha)
November 30, 2022 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 11/30/2022 Re: Judge Nelson Stephen Roman #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Correctional Officer Keenan A. John, Correctional Sergeant Bermann Joseph, Correctional Officer Shaun H. Kerr. (sha)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to issue summonses for the defendants; complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for the defendants; and deliver all documents necessary to effect service on the defendants to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court further directs the defendants to comply with Local Civil Rule 33.2 within 120 days of service of the complaint. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 11/29/2022) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
November 29, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)
November 29, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
November 2, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Christian Castelan 19-A-4453 Sing Sing Correctional Facility 354 Hunter Street Ossining, NY 10562. Also mailed a copy to the Superintendent of Sing Sing Correctional Facility. (kh) Modified on 11/2/2022 (kh).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/1/2022) (vn)
October 31, 2022 Case Designated Local Rule 33.2. (jjg)
October 28, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Christian Castelan..(rdz)
October 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Keenan A. John, Bermann Joseph, Shaun H. Kerr. Document filed by Christian Castelan..(rdz)
October 28, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Christian Castelan..(rdz)
October 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castelan v. John et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Castelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Keenan A. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Shaun H. Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Block Sergeant Bermann Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?