Hopkins v. The Wykagyl Country Club
Plaintiff: Robert "Bobby" Hopkins, Robert Bobby Hopkins, Christopher Arroyo and Charles Jeffers
Defendant: The Wykagyl Country Club
Case Number: 7:2022cv10399
Filed: December 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Jonathan M. Kozak in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DOL Opinion Letters, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. IRS, Revenue Ruling).(Kozak, Jonathan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 27 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Douglas B. Lipsky in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 24 AFFIRMATION of Jonathan M. Kozak in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint).(Kozak, Jonathan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #23) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan) Modified on 6/21/2023 (lb). Modified on 6/21/2023 (db).
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Opposition to be served by 6/9/23. Reply to be served, and all papers to be filed, by 6/21/23. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 1, 2023 Filing 19 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Douglas Lipsky dated 5/31/2023. Document filed by Robert Bobby Hopkins, Christopher Arroyo, Charles Jeffers..(Lipsky, Douglas)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Opposition to be served by 6/2/23. Reply to be served, and all papers to be filed, by 6/14/23. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 17 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for Plaintiffs' opposition and Defendant's reply (revised) addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan M. Kozak dated 05/19/2023. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Opposition to be served by 6/1/23. Reply to be served, and all papers to be filed, by 6/14/23. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for Plaintiff's opposition and Defendant's reply addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan M. Kozak dated 05/19/2023. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
April 21, 2023 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
March 28, 2023 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against The Wykagyl Country Club with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert Bobby Hopkins, Christopher Arroyo, Charles Jeffers. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Lipsky, Douglas)
March 14, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 3/14/2023. Plaintiff's counsel Douglas Lipsky, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel Jonathan Kozak, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Saniya Suri appears telephonically. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (if there will be one) to be submitted by March 28, 2023. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (or Answer) to be submitted by April 25, 2023; Plaintiff's opposition (if Motion filed) due May 25, 2023; Defendant's reply due June 5, 2023. This proceeding was recorded via the AT&T Teleconference platform. (wc)
March 8, 2023 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 4/7/2023.(ah)
March 7, 2023 Filing 12 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Douglas B. Lipsky dated March 7, 2023 re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan M. Kozak dated 02/07/2023. . Document filed by Robert Bobby Hopkins..(Lipsky, Douglas)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/2/2023. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Conference: Telephonic pre-motion conference to be held on 3/14/23 at 10:15 am. Call 877-336-1839 and enter access code 1047966#. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's letter, by letter of no more than 3 pages, no later than 3/7/23. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan M. Kozak dated 02/07/2023. Document filed by The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
February 7, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Chow on behalf of The Wykagyl Country Club..(Chow, Jill)
February 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Marc Kozak on behalf of The Wykagyl Country Club..(Kozak, Jonathan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Wykagyl Country Club waiver sent on 12/9/2022, answer due 2/7/2023. Document filed by Robert Bobby Hopkins..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Wykagyl Country Club. (vf)
December 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas Brian Lipsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert "Bobby" Hopkins. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered with quotation marks. (vf)
December 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Douglas Brian Lipsky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331 Fed. Question; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation; the County code has been modified to New York. (vf)
December 9, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 9, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 8, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 8, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Wykagyl Country Club, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert "Bobby" Hopkins..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Wykagyl Country Club. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27062002)Document filed by Robert "Bobby" Hopkins..(Lipsky, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. The Wykagyl Country Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert "Bobby" Hopkins
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bobby Hopkins
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Arroyo
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jeffers
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wykagyl Country Club
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Kozak
Represented By: Jill Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?