Katz et al v. Landau et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Katz and Chaya Katz
Defendant: Cheskel Landau, Etya Landau, CONGREGATION YETEV LEV D'SATMAR, INC., CONGREGATION ATZEI CHAIM OF SIGET, INC., Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum, PRO MED STAFFING RESOURCE, INC, Mendy Hirsch, Rabbi Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum and Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2023cv00255
Filed: January 11, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc., Mendy Hirsch, Cheskel Landau, Etya Landau, Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc., Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Levenson, Scott)
March 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Scott Levenson. RE-FILE Document No. #40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the individual filers were NOT selected for the voluntary dismissal;. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (nd)
March 22, 2023 Filing 40 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc., Mendy Hirsch, Cheskel Landau, Etya Landau, Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc., Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Court Form Notice).(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 3/23/2023 (nd).
March 22, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Scott Levenson. RE-FILE Document No. #39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the individual filer/filers was/were not selected for the voluntary dismissal; (2) the PDF for the voluntary dismissal is not filled out (Blank Document). Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct individual filer/filers - select the correct individual party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
March 21, 2023 Filing 39 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc., Mendy Hirsch, Cheskel Landau, Etya Landau, Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc., Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 3/22/2023 (tp).
March 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Scott Levenson. RE-FILE Document No. #38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against were NOT selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (nd)
March 20, 2023 Filing 38 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 3/21/2023 (nd).
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #36 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Requesting permission to file a Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from John W. Mitchell, Esq. The Court notes that as reflected on the docket, Defendant Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc. has not filed a motion for sanction, rather, it filed a pre-letter motion pursuant to the Court's Individual Rule 3.A.ii seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss, which proposes including arguments for sanctions. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' request for an extension to respond, pursuant to the Court's Individual Rule 3.A.ii, to Defendant's letter on or before March 20, 2023. Responses due by 3/20/2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/17/2023) (ate)
March 15, 2023 Filing 36 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Requesting permission to file a Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from John W. Mitchell, Esq. dated 03/10/2023. addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Scott C. Levenson dated March 15, 2023. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
March 14, 2023 Filing 35 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from AVRAHAM MOSKOWITZ dated March 14 2023. Document filed by Cheskel Landau..(Moskowitz, Avraham)
March 13, 2023 Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #33 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Requesting permission to file a Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jacob Laufer, Esq. dated 03/13/2023. filed by Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc., Mendy Hirsch. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs are directed to respond to Defendants' letter on or before March 15, 2023. ( Responses due by 3/15/2023) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/13/2023) (ate)
March 13, 2023 Filing 33 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Requesting permission to file a Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jacob Laufer, Esq. dated 03/13/2023. Document filed by Mendy Hirsch, Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc...(Laufer, Jacob)
March 13, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Laufer on behalf of Mendy Hirsch, Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc...(Laufer, Jacob)
March 12, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Avraham Chaim Moskowitz on behalf of Cheskel Landau..(Moskowitz, Avraham)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER with respect to #29 Letter Motion for Conference Requesting permission to file a Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from John W. Mitchell, Esq. dated 03/10/2023. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to Defendants' pre-motion letter on or before Wednesday, March 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/10/2023) (vfr)
March 10, 2023 Filing 29 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Requesting permission to file a Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from John W. Mitchell, Esq. dated 03/10/2023. Document filed by Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc...(Mitchell, John)
March 10, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/15/2023 (vfr)
March 9, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gedalia Moshe Stern on behalf of Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum..(Stern, Gedalia)
March 8, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Wylie Mitchell on behalf of Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc...(Mitchell, John)
March 8, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Wylie Mitchell on behalf of Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum..(Mitchell, John)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: PLAINTIFFS JOSEPH KATZ, and wife CHAYA KATZ, by and through undersigned counsel, and pursuant to CVP Rule 3217 hereby voluntarily dismiss without prejudice their Amended Complaint against Defendant Congregation Yetev Lev D'Satmar, Inc. SO ORDERED. Congregation Yetev Lev D'Satmar, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/3/2023) (ate)
March 2, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Congregation Yetev Lev D'Satmar, Inc.. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Levenson, Scott)
February 24, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Etya Landau served on 2/20/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. Service was accepted by Cheskel Landau. Document filed by Chaya Katz; Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 24, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Cheskel Landau served on 2/20/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. Service was accepted by Cheskel Landau. Document filed by Chaya Katz; Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 24, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc., Cheskel Landau, Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum, Mendy Hirsch, Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc., Etya Landau, Congregation Yetev Lev D'Satmar, Inc... Service was attempted on 2/20/2023. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz., SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 9, 2023 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc...(jgo)
February 9, 2023 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 19 Electronic Summons Issued. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jgo)
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mendy Hirsch..(gp)
February 1, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cheskel Landau..(gp)
February 1, 2023 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Etya Landau..(gp)
February 1, 2023 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc...(gp)
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Congregation Yetev Lev D'Satmar, Inc...(gp)
February 1, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum..(gp)
February 1, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rabbi Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum, re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Congregation Yetev Lev D'satmar, Inc., re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pro Med Staffing Resources, Inc, re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Etya Landau, re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cheskel Landau, re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc., re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mendy Hirsch, re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Congregation Atzei Chaim of Siget, Inc., Congregation Yetev Lev D'Satmar, Inc., Mendy Hirsch, Cheskel Landau, Etya Landau, Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc., Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N).(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet. Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, against All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N).(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/1/2023 (gp).
January 13, 2023 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
January 13, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the pleading was not signed by the attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Craig Levenson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CONGREGATION YETEV LEV D'SATMAR, INC.; CONGREGATION ATZEI CHAIM OF SIGET, INC.; PRO MED STAFFING RESOURCE, INC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Craig Levenson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
January 11, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27189981)Document filed by Chaya Katz, Joseph Katz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Email from Def Cheskel Landau pretending to be a fictitious man named Jason Gold, #3 Exhibit Email from Def Cheskel Landau pretending to be a fictitious man named Eric Johnson, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff Chaya Katz sent a text message to Defendant Landau,, #5 Exhibit text exchange between Plaintiff Joseph and Defendant Cheskel Landau, #6 Exhibit text exchange between Plaintiff Joseph and Defendant Cheskel Landau, #7 Exhibit Yaakov Ber texting Joseph Katz, #8 Exhibit More Texts between Yaakov Ber and Joseph Katz, #9 Exhibit YBT and JK copy of the text messages from January 10th and January 11th, 2022, #10 Exhibit Copy of money transfer of Plaintiff Katz received a Zelle deposit from Defendant Cong Atzei for $5,000, confirmation code RT0GGGJKC6 containing the subject line Chesky Londo, #11 Exhibit Copy of Money transfer of On October 8, 2022, Plaintiff Katz received a Zelle deposit of funds from Defendant Cong Atzei for $1000, #12 Exhibit Article - Rabbi Yaakov Ber, who is the son of Zalman TEITELBAUM, the Grand Rabbi of Satmar, is widely believed to be the next Grand Rabbi of Satmar. Grand Rabbi Zalman Teitelbaum was recently in the news for visiting a convicted child molester, Nechemya Weberman., #13 Exhibit In April, 2022, Plaintiff Katz received two checks, one numbered 5786 and dated April 12, 2022, and the other dated April 15, 2022 and numbered 5788 from the parents of Defendant Etya Landau, Landaus wife. Each check was for $5,000. Copies of these returned check are attached hereto as Exhibits M and N., #14 Exhibit In April, 2022, Plaintiff Katz received two checks, one numbered 5786 and dated April 12, 2022, and the other dated April 15, 2022 and numbered 5788 from the parents of Defendant Etya Landau, Landaus wife. Each check was for $5,000. Copies of these returned check are attached hereto as Exhibits M and N., #15 Exhibit Fraudulent Spreadsheet created by Landau).(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 1/12/2023 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katz et al v. Landau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Katz
Represented By: Scott Craig Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaya Katz
Represented By: Scott Craig Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheskel Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etya Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGREGATION YETEV LEV D'SATMAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGREGATION ATZEI CHAIM OF SIGET, INC.
Represented By: John Wylie Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO MED STAFFING RESOURCE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendy Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbi Yaakov Ber Teitelbaum
Represented By: Gedalia Moshe Stern
Represented By: John Wylie Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Med Staffing Resource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?