Jimenez v. Lashley et al
Plaintiff: Steven Jimenez
Defendant: Mr. Lashley, Mr. Boyd and Mr. Mahone
Case Number: 7:2023cv00628
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from S. Jimenez, dated I am writing because I want to know the next step which I need to take, and an update on my Complaint sent in January 2023. Audios are now being covered-up like other crimes committed by the correction officers etc. Document filed by Steven Jimenez.(sc)
March 16, 2023 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #9 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from S. Jimenez received on 3/16/23. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
March 16, 2023 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Steven Jimenez, 14-A-3174, at Green Haven Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 4000, Stormville, NY 12582-4000 on 03/16/2023. (ta)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Steven Jimenez, 14-A-3174, at Green Haven Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 4000, Stormville, NY 12582-4000, on 3/3/2023 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge.(sha)
March 3, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sergeant Boyd, Sergeant Lashley, C.O. Mahone. (sha)
March 3, 2023 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 3/3/2023 Re: Judge Nelson Stephen Roman #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Sergeant Boyd, Sergeant Lashley, C.O. Mahone. (sha)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summonses for Defendants Sergeant Lashley, Sergeant Body, and C.O. Mahone, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these Defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. Local Civil Rule 33.2 applies to this action. Plaintiff is referred to the NYLAG Pro Se Clinic. Copies of the Clinic's flyer, retainer, and intake form are attached to this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/1/2023) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
March 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)
March 1, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
February 9, 2023 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven Jimenez. (vn)
January 27, 2023 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Green Haven Correctional Facility 594 Rt. 216 Stormville, NY 12582-0010. (dsh)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/26/2023) (sha)
January 20, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Steven Jimenez..(rdz)
January 20, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Boyd, Lashley, Mahone. Document filed by Steven Jimenez..(rdz) Modified on 1/25/2023 (rdz).
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Steven Jimenez..(rdz)
January 20, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) Modified on 1/25/2023 (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Lashley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Lashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Mahone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?