Wade v. Town of Fishkill et al
Plaintiff: Chassity Wade
Defendant: Town of Fishkill and Joseph DiPalma
Case Number: 7:2023cv01623
Filed: February 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2023 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/20/2023 at 01:00 PM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
April 13, 2023 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/12/2023.(ah)
April 10, 2023 NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR MEDIATION: This case has been selected for participation in the Southern District of New York's mediation program.(rpr)
April 10, 2023 1983 PLAN 100-DAY REVIEW: The mediator shall be available to the parties throughout the discovery phase of the Plan and shall schedule and hold the first mediation session in the case within fourteen (14) days of the close of the discovery period. In the event that the mediation cannot begin within the time set forth herein, the assigned mediator shall promptly notify the Mediation Supervisor of the date by which the mediation will begin and the reason for the delay. The mediator shall correspond with the Mediation Office to arrange a mutually convenient date and time to hold the first session. 1983-Plan Review due by 7/19/2023. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/24/2023.(rpr)
March 30, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Joseph DiPalma, Town of Fishkill..(Sokoloff, Brian)
March 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Sokoloff on behalf of Joseph DiPalma, Town of Fishkill..(Sokoloff, Brian)
March 10, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Joseph DiPalma served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. Service was accepted by Rebecca Tompkins. Document filed by Chassity Wade..(Goldman, Jonathan)
March 10, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Town of Fishkill served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. Service was accepted by Rebecca Tompkins. Document filed by Chassity Wade..(Goldman, Jonathan)
March 3, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN 1983 PLAN: Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's 1983 Plan. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation, to review the 1983 Plan for White Plains, effective October 3, 2016, for important information.(rpr)
February 28, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph DiPalma..(pc)
February 28, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town of Fishkill..(pc)
February 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 28, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 27, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph DiPalma, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chassity Wade..(Goldman, Jonathan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town of Fishkill, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chassity Wade..(Goldman, Jonathan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Jonathan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph DiPalma, Town of Fishkill. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27394660)Document filed by Chassity Wade..(Goldman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Town of Fishkill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chassity Wade
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Fishkill
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph DiPalma
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?