United States of America v. United Alloys and Steel Corporation
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: United Alloys and Steel Corporation
Case Number: 7:2023cv01968
Filed: March 8, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land - Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT DECREE: Within 30 days after the Effective Date, Settling Defendant shall make payments to the EPA Hazardous Substance Superfund in the amounts and on the schedule set forth in Appendix A to this Consent Decree. Upon approval and entry of this Consent Decree by the Court, this Consent Decree shall constitute the final judgment between and among the United States and Settling Defendant. The Court enters this judgment as a final judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 and 58. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #4 CONSENT MOTION to Approve proposed consent decree . filed by United States of America. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/18/2023) (ate) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing. Modified on 4/19/2023 (ate).
April 17, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 CONSENT MOTION to Approve proposed consent decree . . Document filed by United States of America..(Sun, Anthony)
April 17, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT MOTION to Approve proposed consent decree . Document filed by United States of America..(Sun, Anthony)
March 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anthony Jan-Huan Sun. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
March 9, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 9, 2023 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 9, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of lodging of proposed consent decree. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed consent decree).(Sun, Anthony)
March 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sun, Anthony)
March 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Alloys and Steel Corporation. Document filed by United States of America..(Sun, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. United Alloys and Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Alloys and Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?