Mid-New York Environmental and Sustainability Promotion Committee, Inc. et al v. Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mid-New York Environmental and Sustainability Promotion Committee, Inc. doing business as NYenvironcon, Robert Majcher, Grace Woodard and Alex Scilla
Defendant: Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2023cv04870
Filed: June 9, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. § 1365 Clean Water Act - Citizen Suits re Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from E. Christopher Murray dated August 7, 2023 re: response to Dragon Springs intent to move to dismiss the complaint.. Document filed by Robert Majcher, Mid-New York Environmental and Sustainability Promotion Committee, Inc., Alex Scilla, Grace Woodard..(Murray, Christopher)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth S Sy on behalf of Robert Majcher, Mid-New York Environmental and Sustainability Promotion Committee, Inc., Alex Scilla, Grace Woodard..(Sy, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joshua J. Grauer dated July 31, 2023 re: Dragon Springs's intent to move to dismiss the complaint. Document filed by Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc...(Grauer, Joshua)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael V. Caruso dated June 29, 2023. Granted. SO ORDERED. Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc. answer due 7/31/2023. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/29/2023) (ama)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc...(Grauer, Joshua)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael V. Caruso dated June 29, 2023. Document filed by Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc...(Caruso, Michael)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan Markham Goodhouse on behalf of Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc...(Goodhouse, Brendan)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Vincent Caruso on behalf of Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc...(Caruso, Michael)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua J. Grauer on behalf of Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc...(Grauer, Joshua)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc...(jgo)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so redesignated. (vba)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Gregory H. Woods is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher E Murray. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MID-NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL AND SUSTAINABILITY PROMOTION COMMITTEE, INC. (d/b/a NYENVIRONCOM); ROBERT MAJCHER; GRACE WOODARD; ALEX SCILLA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher E Murray to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murray, Christopher) Modified on 6/12/2023 (jgo).
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DRAGON SPRINGS BUDDHIST INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ROBERT MAJCHER, MID-NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL AND SUSTAINABILITY PROMOTION COMMITTEE, INC. (d/b/a NYENVIRONCOM), ALEX SCILLA, GRACE WOODARD..(Murray, Christopher)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27854700)Document filed by ALEX SCILLA, MID-NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL AND SUSTAINABILITY PROMOTION COMMITTEE, INC. (d/b/a NYENVIRONCOM), GRACE WOODARD, ROBERT MAJCHER..(Murray, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-New York Environmental and Sustainability Promotion Committee, Inc. et al v. Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-New York Environmental and Sustainability Promotion Committee, Inc. doing business as NYenvironcon
Represented By: Christopher E Murray
Represented By: Elizabeth S Sy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Majcher
Represented By: Christopher E Murray
Represented By: Elizabeth S Sy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Woodard
Represented By: Christopher E Murray
Represented By: Elizabeth S Sy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Scilla
Represented By: Christopher E Murray
Represented By: Elizabeth S Sy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragon Springs Buddhist, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Grauer
Represented By: Brendan Markham Goodhouse
Represented By: Michael Vincent Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?