United States Of America v. Pushkal et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America,
Defendant: Thomas Pushkal, Jennifer Vanover, Edward Pushkal, Frances Pushkal and Maplewood Warmbloods, LLC
Case Number: 7:2023cv06288
Filed: July 20, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. § 1251 Federal Water Pollution Control Act (Clean Water Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Maplewood Warmbloods, LLC, Thomas Pushkal, Jennifer Vanover..(Burke, Michael)
September 14, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Isaacs on behalf of Edward Pushkal, Frances Pushkal..(Isaacs, Christine)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that William S. Gyves of the law firm Kelley Drye & Warren LLP, 3 World Trade Center, 175 Greenwich Street, New York, NY, 10007, Tel. No. (212) 808-7800, Fax No. (212) 808-7897, wgyves@kelleydrye.com, be substituted as counsel of record for defendants Edward Pushkal and Frances Pushkal, in place of Michael Kennedy Burke of the law firm Hodges Walsh & Burke, LLP. 55 Church St., Suite 211, White Plains, NY, 10601. Tel. No. (914) 385-6000, Fax No. (914) 385-6060, mburke@hwb-lawfirm.com. SO ORDERED. Attorney Michael Kennedy Burke terminated. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/13/2023) (tg)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Edward Pushkal and Frances Pushkal may have until 10/12/23 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
September 13, 2023 Filing 22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from William S. Gyves dated September 13, 2023. Document filed by Edward Pushkal, Frances Pushkal..(Gyves, William)
September 13, 2023 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Edward Pushkal, Frances Pushkal..(Gyves, William)
September 12, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William S. Gyves on behalf of Edward Pushkal, Frances Pushkal..(Gyves, William)
September 8, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Kennedy Burke on behalf of Maplewood Warmbloods, LLC, Edward Pushkal, Frances Pushkal, Thomas Pushkal, Jennifer Vanover..(Burke, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Frances Pushkal served on 7/29/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
August 7, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Edward Pushkal served on 7/29/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
August 7, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jennifer Vanover served on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
August 7, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Thomas Pushkal served on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
August 7, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Maplewood Warmbloods, LLC served on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
July 25, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frances Pushkal. (vf)
July 25, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward Pushkal. (vf)
July 25, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer Vanover. (vf)
July 25, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Pushkal. (vf)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maplewood Warmbloods, LLC. (vf)
July 24, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frances Pushkal, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
July 24, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edward Pushkal, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
July 24, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jennifer Vanover, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
July 24, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Pushkal, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
July 24, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maplewood Warmbloods LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
July 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Bannon on behalf of United States Of America,..(Bannon, Zachary)
July 21, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 21, 2023 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 21, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alyssa O'Gallagher. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
July 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Gallagher, Alyssa)
July 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maplewood Warmbloods, LLC, Edward Pushkal, Frances Pushkal, Thomas Pushkal, Jennifer Vanover. Document filed by United States Of America,..(O'Gallagher, Alyssa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Pushkal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America,
Represented By: Alyssa O'Gallagher
Represented By: Zachary Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Pushkal
Represented By: Michael Kennedy Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Vanover
Represented By: Michael Kennedy Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Pushkal
Represented By: William S. Gyves
Represented By: Christine Isaacs
Represented By: Michael Kennedy Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Pushkal
Represented By: Christine Isaacs
Represented By: Michael Kennedy Burke
Represented By: William S. Gyves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maplewood Warmbloods, LLC
Represented By: Michael Kennedy Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?