Gallardo et al v. Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC
Plaintiff: Erick Gallardo and Cesar Gallardo
Defendant: Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC
Case Number: 7:2023cv06631
Filed: July 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC..(Reitzas, Joshua)
September 21, 2023 Filing 11 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC..(Reitzas, Joshua)
September 8, 2023 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/10/2023.(sge)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: This case is determined to be eligible for mediation as to all issues regarding Defendants. The entire mediation process is confidential. The parties and the Mediator may not disclose information regarding the process, including settlement terms, to the Court or to third persons unless all parties agree. The identity of the Mediator is not to be disclosed even to the Court. However, persons authorized by the Court to administer or evaluate the mediation program may have access to information necessary to administer or evaluate the program and parties, and counsel and mediators may respond to confidential inquiries or surveys by said persons authorized by the Court to administer or evaluate the mediation program. The mediation process shall be treated as a compromise negotiation for purposes of the Federal Rules of Evidence and state rules of evidence. The Mediator is disqualified as a witness, consultant, attorney, or expert in any pending or future action relating to the dispute, including actions between persons not parties to the mediation process. Entry of this case into the Court's mediation program shall not be deemed to change any timetable set by the Court contained in a scheduling order or otherwise governing the completion of discovery, motion practice or trial date. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. SO ORDERED. (Mediator to be Assigned by 8/31/2023.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/17/23) (yv)
August 14, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Plaintiffs' Counsel Abdul K. Hassan, Esq. dated August 14, 2023 re: Request for Referral to Mediation Program. Document filed by Erick Gallardo, Cesar Gallardo..(Hassan, Abdul)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiffs ERICK GALLARDO and CESAR GALLARDO ("Plaintiffs") and Defendant AURORA DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CENTER LLC ("Aurora") that the time for Aurora to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed in the above-captioned matter on July 30, 2023, is hereby extended through and includes September 21, 2023; and IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation may be signed in counterparts, and facsimile and electronic signatures will constitute originals for purposes of this Stipulation. Granted. SO ORDERED. Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC answer due 9/21/2023. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/14/2023) (vfr)
August 11, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC..(Reitzas, Joshua)
August 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua T. Reitzas on behalf of Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC..(Reitzas, Joshua)
August 1, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. Service was accepted by New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Erick Gallardo; Cesar Gallardo..(Hassan, Abdul)
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC..(jgo)
July 31, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 31, 2023 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 31, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 30, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
July 30, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erick Gallardo, Cesar Gallardo..(Hassan, Abdul)
July 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28073471)Document filed by Erick Gallardo, Cesar Gallardo..(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallardo et al v. Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Gallardo
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Gallardo
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Digital Technology Center LLC
Represented By: Joshua T. Reitzas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?