Pepe, Jr. v. Kenev Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Pepe, Jr
Defendant: Kenev Inc. d/b/a Boatmax Inc., a/k/a KenMax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II Inc., Rapid Liens Inc., Eddie Carpenter, jr, Kenev Inc. doing business as Boatmax Inc. and Kenmax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II
Case Number: 7:2023cv07747
Filed: August 31, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenmax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II. (vf)
September 20, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenev Inc.. (vf)
September 19, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenmax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph)
September 19, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenev Inc. D/b/a Boatmax Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph)
September 19, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Kenmax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Cacciato, Joseph)
September 18, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rapid Liens Inc...(gp)
September 18, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eddie Carpenter, Jr..(gp)
September 18, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Cockburn Cacciato, I to RE-FILE Document No. 6. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the TO section of the PDF does not match the entire name of the party on the pleading/docket. (REVIEW THE DOCKET SHEET) Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
September 18, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph Cockburn Cacciato, I re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF (KenMax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II Inc). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (gp)
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eddie Carpenter Jr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph)
September 15, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rapid Liens Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph)
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenev Inc. d/b/a Boatmax, Kenmax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph) Modified on 9/18/2023 (gp).
September 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Cockburn Cacciato, I to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error. Defendant party name listed on Summons PDF and Summons Caption does not correspond exactly to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
September 12, 2023 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rapid Liens, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph) Modified on 9/13/2023 (vf).
September 12, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenev d/b/a Boatmax, a/k/a Kenmax d/b/a Boatmax II, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph) Modified on 9/13/2023 (vf).
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eddie Carpenter Jr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph) Modified on 9/13/2023 (vf).
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cacciato, Joseph)
September 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Cockburn Cacciato, I. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Eddie Carpenter, jr, Kenev Inc. d/b/a Boatmax Inc., a/k/a KenMax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
September 1, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
September 1, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
September 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Cockburn Cacciato, I. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:0552; County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the County code has been modified to Westchester. (sj)
September 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joseph Cockburn Cacciato, I. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
September 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph Cockburn Cacciato, I re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
August 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eddie Carpenter, jr, Kenev Inc. d/b/a Boatmax Inc., a/k/a KenMax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II Inc., Rapid Liens Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28224864)Document filed by Anthony Pepe, Jr..(Cacciato, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepe, Jr. v. Kenev Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Pepe, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Cockburn Cacciato, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenev Inc. d/b/a Boatmax Inc., a/k/a KenMax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid Liens Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Carpenter, jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenev Inc. doing business as Boatmax Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenmax Inc. d/b/a Boatmax II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?