Riverkeeper, Inc. v. Royal Coach Lines, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: Royal Coach Lines, LLC doing business as Royal Coach Lines, Inc., Royal Coach Lines, Inc. and Royal Coach Lines, LLC
Case Number: 7:2024cv01234
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Clean Water Act - Citizen Suits re Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against Royal Coach Lines, Inc., Royal Coach Lines, LLC. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Altchiler, Andie)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 2/23/2024) (jca)
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibit A addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Andie M. Altchiler dated February 22, 2024. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Complaint).(Altchiler, Andie)
February 21, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Kathryn Muench on behalf of Riverkeeper, Inc...(Muench, Julia)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Royal Coach Lines, Inc., Royal Coach Lines, LLC. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc...(Altchiler, Andie)
February 21, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Royal Coach Lines, Inc.. (vf)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Royal Coach Lines, LLC. (vf)
February 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andie M Altchiler. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Royal Coach Lines, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was removed. (vf)
February 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andie M Altchiler to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
February 21, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 21, 2024 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 21, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROYAL COACH LINES, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc...(Altchiler, Andie)
February 20, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROYAL COACH LINES, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc...(Altchiler, Andie)
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Altchiler, Andie)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28969788)Document filed by Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - Notice of Violation and Intent to File Suit).(Altchiler, Andie) Modified on 2/21/2024 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riverkeeper, Inc. v. Royal Coach Lines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Andie M Altchiler
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Coach Lines, LLC doing business as Royal Coach Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Coach Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Coach Lines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?