Holtec International et al v. The State Of New York
Plaintiff: Holtec International and Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC
Defendant: The State Of New York
Counter Defendant: Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC and Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC
Case Number: 7:2024cv02929
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 dj Fed. Question: Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from James Catterson dated June 13, 2024. Document filed by Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International..(Catterson, James)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for an initial conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wednesday, June 26, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5:00 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: The Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/4/24) (yv)
May 23, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International. Document filed by The State Of New York..(Bein, Philip)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JAY E. SILBERG granting #14 Motion for Jay E. Silberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/3/2024) (vfr)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Philp Bein dated April 29, 2024., #1 Complaint,. Granted. So Ordered. (The State Of New York answer due 5/24/2024.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/2/24) (yv)
April 29, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Jay E. Silberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29281673. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A DC Good Standing Certificate, #2 Affidavit Declaraation of Jay Silberg, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Silberg, Jay)
April 29, 2024 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Philp Bein dated April 29, 2024. Document filed by The State Of New York..(Bein, Philip)
April 29, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Michael Bein on behalf of The State Of New York..(Bein, Philip)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANNE. R. LEIDICH granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Anne R. Leidich, Esq. for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned matter is granted. As further set forth by this Order. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/27/2024) (tg)
April 29, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Jay E. Silberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29281673. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
April 26, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Anne R. Leidich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29272954. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
April 25, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Anne R. Leidich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29272954. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit MD Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Declaration of A Leidich).(Leidich, Anne)
April 23, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The State Of New York served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. Service was accepted by Jasmine Hughes - Office Assistant. Document filed by Holtec International; Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC; Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC; Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC..(Catterson, James)
April 19, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The State Of New York..(gp)
April 19, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
April 19, 2024 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
April 19, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
April 18, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The State of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International..(Catterson, James)
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Holtec International for Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC. Document filed by Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International..(Catterson, James)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International..(Catterson, James)
April 18, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Holtec International for Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC. Document filed by Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International..(Catterson, James)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Holtec International for Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC. Document filed by Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec International..(Catterson, James)
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Catterson, James)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The State Of New York. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29235017)Document filed by Holtec International, Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC, Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC..(Catterson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtec International et al v. The State Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holtec International
Represented By: James M. Catterson
Represented By: Anne Renee Leidich
Represented By: Jay Eliot Silberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holtec Indian Point 2, LLC
Represented By: James M. Catterson
Represented By: Anne Renee Leidich
Represented By: Jay Eliot Silberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Holtec Indian Point 3, LLC
Represented By: James M. Catterson
Represented By: Anne Renee Leidich
Represented By: Jay Eliot Silberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Holtec Decommissioning International, LLC
Represented By: James M. Catterson
Represented By: Anne Renee Leidich
Represented By: Jay Eliot Silberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Of New York
Represented By: Philip Michael Bein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?