Paige v. Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MICHELE PAIGE
Defendant: DIGITAL BUSINESS NETWORKS ALLIANCE, LLC, OFS PORTAL, LLC, MCGINNIS LOCHRIDGE, PHILLIP SCHMANDT and OFS Portal LLC
Case Number: 7:2024cv03169
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #44 Letter Request for Service filed by Michele Paige ENDORSEMENT: Both requests are granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/12/24) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 6/8/2024 re: Request for Service. Document filed by Michele Paige..(rro)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #38 MOTION for Discovery. filed by Michele Paige. ENDORSEMENT : The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motions. (See Dkt. Nos. 37, 38.) It will address Plaintiff's requests for jurisdictional discovery when it rules on Defendants' forthcoming Motion To Dismiss. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/3/24) (yv)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #39 Letter Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by OFS Portal LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's submission was premature and can be included in the Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss when they are filed. The Clerk is asked to mail a copy of this document to Plaintiff. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/3/24) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 40-41. Mailed to: MichelePaige 13223 Haldane Alley Orlando, FL 32827. (vn)
June 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter Motion to Strike Defendants' Response at Dkt. #39 (JurisdictionalDiscovery). Document filed by Michele Paige..(rro)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/31/2024 re: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Letter at Dkt. #39. Document filed by Michele Paige.(rro)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Evan Weintraub dated May 31, 2024 re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by OFS Portal LLC..(Weintraub, Evan)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Document filed by Michele Paige. (tg)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #35 Memo Endorsement,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to Michele Paige 13223 Haldane Alley Orlando, FL 32827..(nb)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Third Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/24/2024. Document filed by Michele Paige..(rro)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #34 Letter filed by OFS Portal LLC, ENDORSEMENT: Defense Motion to Dismiss the SAC is due 6/24/24. Plaintiff's response is due 7/24/24. Defense reply is due 817/24. The Clerk is asked to mail a copy of this document to Plaintiff. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/24/2024) ( Motions due by 6/24/2024., Responses due by 7/24/2024, Replies due by 8/7/2024.) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/23/2024 re: #27 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jung H. Park dated May 20, 2024., #26 LETTER MOTION for Conference to address defendant OFS Portal LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Evan Weintraub dated May 20, 2024., #25 LETTER MOTION for Conference to address the McGinnis Defendants intended Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Howard I. Elman dated May 20, 2024. Document filed by Michele Paige. (tg)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Evan Weintraub dated May 23, 2024 re: Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by OFS Portal LLC..(Weintraub, Evan)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL amending #30 Amended Complaint, against Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC, McGinnis Lochridge, OFS Portal LLC, Phillip Schmandt with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michele Paige. Related document: #30 Amended Complaint,..(rro)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/21/2024 re: Plaintiffs Motion to Amend. Document filed by Michele Paige..(rro)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/21/2024 re: Plaintiff respectfully submits the Court to consider granting jurisdictional discovery. Document filed by Michele Paige.(tro)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/19/2024 re: I needed to correct a few minor errors on the Letter Motion that I filed on Sunday. Document filed by Michele Paige..(kgo)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jung H. Park dated May 20, 2024. Document filed by Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC..(Park, Jung)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Conference to address defendant OFS Portal LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Evan Weintraub dated May 20, 2024. Document filed by OFS Portal LLC..(Weintraub, Evan)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Conference to address the McGinnis Defendants intended Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Howard I. Elman dated May 20, 2024. Document filed by McGinnis Lochridge, Phillip Schmandt..(Elman, Howard)
May 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL amending #15 Amended Complaint against Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC, McGinnis Lochridge, OFS Portal LLC, Phillip Schmandt with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michele Paige. Related document: #15 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 1, #2 Supplement 2, #3 Supplement 3).(kgo)
May 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Document filed by Michele Paige..(kgo)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/8/2024 re: Letter Motion for Pre-Motion Conference (Jurisdictional Discovery.) Document filed by Michele Paige. (rro)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/6/24) (yv)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC answer due 6/19/2024. (yv)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/6/2024 re: Letter on Extension (Dkt. #18). Document filed by Michele Paige.(rro)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jung H. Park dated May 6, 2024 re: Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC..(Park, Jung)
May 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/4/2024 re: I respectfully request that this Court consolidate my motions with whatever the Defendants will file as alluded to in their Letter Motion at ECF No. 16. Document filed by Michele Paige. (rro)
May 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/3/2024. Document filed by Michele Paige.(rro)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michele Paige dated 5/3/2024 re: There are no material disputes in this case because the Defendants prior counsel admitted to everything. Document filed by Michele Paige..(kgo)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Howard I. Elman dated May 3, 2024. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/3/2024) McGinnis Lochridge answer due 6/19/2024; Phillip Schmandt answer due 6/19/2024 (ks)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Howard I. Elman dated May 3, 2024. Document filed by McGinnis Lochridge, Phillip Schmandt..(Elman, Howard)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC, McGinnis Lochridge, OFS Portal LLC, Phillip Schmandt with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michele Paige..(kgo) (Main Document 15 replaced on 6/4/2024) (nb).
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Park, Jung)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Park, Jung) Modified on 4/26/2024 (vf).
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 59018/2024..Document filed by McGinnis Lochridge, OFS Portal LLC, Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC, Phillip Schmandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons with Notice and Demands for Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-List of all of McGinnis partners and their states of citizenship).(Park, Jung)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jung Hyun Park. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DIGITAL BUSINESS NETWORKS ALLIANCE, LLC, OFS PORTAL, LLC, MCGINNIS LOCHRIDGE,PHILLIP SCHMANDT, MICHELE PAIGE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jung Hyun Park. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 2,349,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 2,350,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jung Hyun Park to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Nature of Suit Error. Place an [X] in One Box Only. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jung Hyun Park to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jung Hyun Park to RE-FILE Document No. #13 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Company, Corporate Parent Weatherford International PLC, Corporate Parent Schlumberger Limited, Corporate Parent Halliburton Company for OFS PORTAL, LLC. Document filed by OFS PORTAL, LLC..(Weintraub, Evan)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Evan Silberfein on behalf of MCGINNIS LOCHRIDGE, PHILLIP SCHMANDT..(Silberfein, Scott)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryanne Allene Hankla on behalf of DIGITAL BUSINESS NETWORKS ALLIANCE, LLC..(Hankla, Ryanne)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey William Heineman on behalf of DIGITAL BUSINESS NETWORKS ALLIANCE, LLC..(Heineman, Geoffrey)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jung Hyun Park on behalf of DIGITAL BUSINESS NETWORKS ALLIANCE, LLC..(Park, Jung)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DIGITAL BUSINESS NETWORKS ALLIANCE, LLC..(Park, Jung)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Scott Weintraub on behalf of OFS PORTAL, LLC..(Weintraub, Evan)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MCGINNIS LOCHRIDGE, PHILLIP SCHMANDT..(Elman, Howard)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Ian Elman on behalf of MCGINNIS LOCHRIDGE, PHILLIP SCHMANDT..(Elman, Howard)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Park, Jung) Modified on 4/26/2024 (vf).
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 59018/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29271046).Document filed by DIGITAL BUSINESS NETWORKS ALLIANCE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons with Notice and Demands for Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-List of all of McGinnis partners and their states of citizenship).(Park, Jung) Modified on 4/26/2024 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paige v. Digital Business Networks Alliance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIGITAL BUSINESS NETWORKS ALLIANCE, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey William Heineman
Represented By: Ryanne Allene Hankla
Represented By: Jung Hyun Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFS PORTAL, LLC
Represented By: Evan Scott Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCGINNIS LOCHRIDGE
Represented By: Howard Ian Elman
Represented By: Scott Evan Silberfein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP SCHMANDT
Represented By: Howard Ian Elman
Represented By: Scott Evan Silberfein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFS Portal LLC
Represented By: Evan Scott Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE PAIGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?