United States of America v. Garden Mini Deli Inc.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Garden Mini Deli Inc.
Case Number: 7:2024cv03888
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1101 Immigration & Nationality Act (Definitions)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendant, Garden Mini Deli Inc., may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter is hereby extended up to and including July 19, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Garden Mini Deli Inc. answer due 7/19/2024.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/20/24) (yv)
June 20, 2024 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by United States of America..(Manfredi, John)
June 19, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Paskoff on behalf of Garden Mini Deli Inc...(Paskoff, Adam)
June 12, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Garden Mini Deli Inc. served on 6/5/2024, answer due 6/26/2024. Service was accepted by Shaed Shasadin. Document filed by United States of America..(Manfredi, John)
June 5, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Garden Mini Deli Inc. served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by United States of America..(Manfredi, John)
May 21, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Garden Mini Deli Inc...(jgo)
May 21, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 21, 2024 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Manfredi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Dollar Demand none; County code Dutchess; Fee Status code pd (paid);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 465 (Other Immigration Actions); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $33,000; the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
May 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Manfredi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
May 21, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Manfredi, John)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Garden Mini Deli Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Manfredi, John)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garden Mini Deli Inc.. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit a, #2 Exhibit exhibit b, #3 Exhibit exhibit c, #4 Exhibit exhibit d, #5 Exhibit exhibit e).(Manfredi, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Garden Mini Deli Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garden Mini Deli Inc.
Represented By: Adam Paskoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?