Weber et al v. American Honda Motor CO., Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana Weber and Nicholas D. Weber
Defendant: American Honda Motor CO., Inc.
Case Number: 7:2024cv05367
Filed: July 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 mv Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Kiley Murphy, III on behalf of American Honda Motor CO., Inc...(Murphy, Thomas)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. may have until 9/20/24 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
September 3, 2024 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from C. Brian Kornbrek dated 9/3/24. Document filed by American Honda Motor CO., Inc...(Kornbrek, Clifford)
August 1, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Honda Motor CO., Inc. served on 7/24/2024, answer due 8/14/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent of Secretary of State. Document filed by Nicholas D. Weber; Dana Weber..(Maurer, Ira)
July 17, 2024 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Maurer, Ira)
July 17, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Honda Motor CO., Inc...(gp)
July 17, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Dana Weber, Nicholas D. Weber..(Maurer, Ira)
July 17, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against American Honda Motor CO., Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29616388)Document filed by Nicholas D. Weber, Dana Weber..(Maurer, Ira)
July 17, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 17, 2024 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 17, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ira Mark Maurer to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
July 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ira Mark Maurer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
July 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ira Mark Maurer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $11000000000; County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (vf)
July 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ira Mark Maurer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; not all the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
July 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ira Mark Maurer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NICHOLAS D WEBER.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
July 16, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by NICHOLAS D WEBER..(Maurer, Ira) Modified on 7/17/2024 (vf).
July 16, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Maurer, Ira) Modified on 7/17/2024 (vf).
July 16, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by NICHOLAS D WEBER..(Maurer, Ira) Modified on 7/17/2024 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber et al v. American Honda Motor CO., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Weber
Represented By: Ira Mark Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas D. Weber
Represented By: Ira Mark Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor CO., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Kiley Murphy, III
Represented By: Clifford Brian Kornbrek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?