Perkins v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: Nayshawn Perkins
Defendant: Ryan Bowers, James Goodson and John and Jane Doe 1-10
Case Number: 7:2024cv05558
Filed: July 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2024 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(tro)
July 26, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
July 24, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Bowers, James Goodson..(jgo)
July 24, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brett Harris Klein to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated May 28, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated May 28, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated May 28, 2024 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
July 24, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brett Harris Klein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Suffolk;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jgo)
July 24, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 24, 2024 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 24, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 23, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Bowers and James Goodson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nayshawn Perkins..(Klein, Brett)
July 23, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Klein, Brett) Modified on 7/24/2024 (jgo).
July 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan Bowers, John and Jane Doe 1-10, James Goodson. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29644087)Document filed by Nayshawn Perkins..(Klein, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Goodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nayshawn Perkins
Represented By: Brett Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?