Wigder v. Allen
Plaintiff: Eliezer Z. Wigder
Defendant: Peter B. Allen
Case Number: 7:2024cv05957
Filed: August 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr Diversity: Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendant removed the instant action to this Court from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Rockland on or about August 6, 2024. (ECF No. 1.) Defendant filed a Verified Answer, dated June 6, 2024 (ECF No. 1, Ex. B), to Plaintiff's Complaint, dated May 20, 2024 (ECF No. 1, Ex. A). Thus, the Court waives the Initial Pre-Trial Conference requirement and directs the parties to submit a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto) by August 30, 2024. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy for general pretrial purposes. The parties are directed to contact Judge McCarthy within seven (7) business days of the date of the Order of Reference to schedule a conference. Defendant is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's counsel and to file proof of service on the docket. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance on or before August 16, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/9/2024) (mml) Modified on 8/9/2024 (mml).
August 8, 2024 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 8, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 8, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 8, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge J. Paul Oetken is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
August 8, 2024 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(tro)
August 7, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Rockland. Case Number: 032892/2024..Document filed by Peter B. Allen..(Downing, John)
August 7, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John M. Downing, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Caption title reads "Supreme Court of the State of New York". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/12/2024. (pc)
August 7, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John M. Downing, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $75,000,000; County code Rockland; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
August 6, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Plaintiff's Office on August 6, 2024. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Peter B. Allen..(Downing, John)
August 6, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Peter B. Allen..(Downing, John)
August 6, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Downing, John)
August 6, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Rockland. Case Number: 032892/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29710711).Document filed by Peter B. Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars).(Downing, John) Modified on 8/7/2024 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wigder v. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter B. Allen
Represented By: John M. Downing, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Z. Wigder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?