Bennet-Conroy v. Mount Vernon City School District/ Board of Education
Petitioner: Dr. Waveline Bennet-Conroy
Respondent: Board of Education of Mount Vernon City School District; and Mount Vernon City School District
Case Number: 7:2024cv06120
Filed: August 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. § 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Letter Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice #7 Letter Motion to Stay. On the basis of this proceeding, and for the reasons stated on the record, it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motions (Dkt. Nos. 4, 7). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/2/2024) (mml)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER terminating #28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; terminating #30 Letter Motion for Conference. The hearing scheduled for September 27, 2024, is moved to October 2, 2024, at 11:30 AM. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motions. (Dkt. Nos. 28, 30.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/16/2024) (sgz) (Main Document 31 replaced on 9/17/2024) (sgz). Modified on 9/17/2024 (sgz).
September 16, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Stay ARBITRATION.. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (sgz)
September 14, 2024 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deveraux L. Cannick dated 09/14/2024. Document filed by Mount Vernon City School District..(Cannick, Deveraux)
September 13, 2024 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph W. Carbonaro dated 09/13/2024 re: Bennett Conroy v. Mount Vernon City School District. Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
September 13, 2024 Filing 28 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to hold oral argument addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph W. Carbonaro dated 09/13/2024. Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: The hearing on Petitioner's Motion to Stay Arbitration is rescheduled to September 27, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 521 at 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York, 10601. SO ORDERED., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to ( Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/13/24) (yv)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER The hearing on Petitioner's Motion to Stay Arbitration will be on September 17, 2024, at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 521 at 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York, 10601. SO ORDERED. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2024 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/11/2024) (jca)
September 6, 2024 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Stay ARBITRATION. . Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
September 3, 2024 Filing 24 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4 MOTION to Stay ARBITRATION., #7 INTERIM MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by Board of Education of Mount Vernon City School District;, Mount Vernon City School District..(Cannick, Deveraux)
September 3, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #6 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Board of Education of Mount Vernon City School District;, Mount Vernon City School District..(Cannick, Deveraux)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #21 Response to Motion, filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's Reply is due by no later than 9/6/24. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 9/6/2024.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/29/2024) (mml)
August 29, 2024 Filing 21 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph W. Carbonaro dated 08/29/2024 re: #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deveraux L. Cannick dated 08/28/2024. . Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Response to Motion, filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy. ENDORSEMENT: The reply is due 9/3/24. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/29/2024) (tg)
August 29, 2024 Filing 19 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph W. Carbonaro dated 08/29/2024 re: #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deveraux L. Cannick dated 08/28/2024. . Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time Granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/28/2024) (jca)
August 28, 2024 Filing 17 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph W. Carbonaro dated 08/28/2024 re: #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deveraux L. Cannick dated 08/28/2024. . Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 28, 2024 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deveraux L. Cannick dated 08/28/2024. Document filed by Mount Vernon City School District..(Cannick, Deveraux)
August 28, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mount Vernon City School District answer due 9/3/2024. (jca)
August 26, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of order to show cause with supporting documents served on Mount Vernon City School District on 08/26/2024. Service was accepted by John Doe Security Guard. Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 26, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of order to show cause and supporting documents served on Board of Education of Mount Vernon City School District on 08/26/2024. Service was accepted by John Doe security guard. Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 24, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Anibal Baez on behalf of Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Baez, Jose)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Petitioner is directed to serve Respondents its proposed Order to Show Cause and supporting papers-and to file proof of such service-by no later than August 26, 2024. Respondents shall file their response to Petitioner's application by no later than August 30, 2024. Petitioner shall file her reply by no later than September 3, 2024. The Parties are reminded that there is a strict page limit of 25 pages for opening briefs and 10 pages for replies. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/22/2024) (tg)
August 22, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 22, 2024 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 22, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 22, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph William Carbonaro. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 790 (Labor: Other); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
August 21, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief . Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 21, 2024 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Joseph W. Carbonaro in Support re: #9 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Charges, #3 Exhibit 3 - Resolution).(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 21, 2024 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 21, 2024 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Charges, #5 Exhibit 3 - Resolution).(Carbonaro, Joseph) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/21/2024 (nd).
August 21, 2024 Filing 7 INTERIM MOTION to Stay . Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Charges, #5 Exhibit 3 - Resolution).(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 21, 2024 Filing 6 PETITION TO STAY ARBITRATION..Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph William Carbonaro to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 8/26/2024. (jgo)
August 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Notice to attorney Joseph Carbonaro to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Supporting documents were not filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief found under the event list Proposed Orders. - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) and dated PDF.. (nd)
August 16, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 15, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay ARBITRATION. Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Memo of Law in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Statement of Charges, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Board resolution).(Carbonaro, Joseph)
August 15, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph William Carbonaro to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/20/2024. (jgo)
August 14, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - PETITION TO STAY ARBITRATION..Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Memo of Law in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Statement of Charges, #5 Errata Exhibit 2 - Board resolution).(Carbonaro, Joseph) Modified on 8/15/2024 (jgo).
August 14, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph William Carbonaro to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the incorrect case number is on the PDF; the pleading must be filed as the main document; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Board of Education of Mount Vernon City School District. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/19/2024. (jgo)
August 14, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph William Carbonaro to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated May 28, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated May 28, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated May 28, 2024 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
August 13, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carbonaro, Joseph) Modified on 8/14/2024 (jgo).
August 13, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - PETITION TO STAY ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29742476).Document filed by Waveline Bennet-Conroy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit petition and declaration, #2 Exhibit memo of law, #3 Exhibit employment agreement, #4 Exhibit statement of charges, #5 Exhibit Board resolution).(Carbonaro, Joseph) Modified on 8/14/2024 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennet-Conroy v. Mount Vernon City School District/ Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Education of Mount Vernon City School District;
Represented By: Deveraux L Cannick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mount Vernon City School District
Represented By: Deveraux L Cannick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dr. Waveline Bennet-Conroy
Represented By: Joseph William Carbonaro
Represented By: Jose Anibal Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?