Stackhouse v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Beatrice Stackhouse
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 7:2024cv09404
Filed: December 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 nr Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
December 11, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Joseph)
December 11, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph O'Connor to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (gp)
December 11, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 11, 2024 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 11, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 10, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart De Mexico, Other Affiliate Seiyu for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Document filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP..(O'Connor, Joseph)
December 10, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 12/11/2024 (gp).
December 10, 2024 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(O'Connor, Joseph)
December 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF004985/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30309033).Document filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint and Verified Answer, #2 Exhibit B-Combined Demands, #3 Exhibit C-Response to 3017 Demand).(O'Connor, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stackhouse v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Joseph O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?