Suleiman v. Sussman et al
Plaintiff: Yazan W. Suleiman
Defendant: Garnet Medical Center and SGT. Ryan Sussman
Case Number: 7:2024cv09593
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Howard Sussman on behalf of Yazan W. Suleiman..(Sussman, Michael)
February 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for an initial conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Tuesday, March 11, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5:00 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (605) 472-5160, Access Code: 4653066. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/2/25) (yv)
December 30, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF009788-2024..Document filed by Ryan Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (state court summons and complaint)).(Sokoloff, Brian)
December 23, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Garnet Medical Center..(Rubin, Jonathan)
December 23, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Ryan Sussman..(Sokoloff, Brian)
December 19, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan D. Rubin on behalf of Garnet Medical Center..(Rubin, Jonathan)
December 19, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 19, 2024 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 19, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brian S. Sokoloff to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
December 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chelsea Gallay on behalf of Garnet Medical Center..(Gallay, Chelsea)
December 18, 2024 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF009788-2024..Document filed by Ryan Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Sokoloff, Brian) Modified on 12/19/2024 (pc).
December 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Rychik on behalf of Garnet Medical Center..(Rychik, Rebecca)
December 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brian S. Sokoloff to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Incorrect Court. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 12/23/2024. (pc)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sokoloff, Brian)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Orange. Case Number: EF009788-2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30336406).Document filed by Ryan Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Sokoloff, Brian) Modified on 12/17/2024 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suleiman v. Sussman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yazan W. Suleiman
Represented By: Michael Howard Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garnet Medical Center
Represented By: Rebecca Rychik
Represented By: Jonathan D. Rubin
Represented By: Chelsea Gallay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. Ryan Sussman
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?