Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5, v. Lucas et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Kyle Lucas, Sharon Lucas a/k/a Blackwell, Advanced Oxy-Med Services, Inc. and John Doe #1 through John Doe #12
Case Number: 7:2024cv09750
Filed: December 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 df Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Filing 25 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to defendant Advanced Oxy-Med Services, Inc. (tp)
February 13, 2025 Filing 24 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to defendant New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. (tp)
February 13, 2025 Filing 23 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to defendant Kyle Lucas. (tp)
February 13, 2025 Filing 22 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to defendant Sharon Lucas a/k/a Blackwell. (tp)
February 12, 2025 Filing 21 AFFIRMATION of SIMRAN JOT KAUR . Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Sheidlower, Eric)
February 12, 2025 Filing 20 AFFIRMATION of ERIC SHEIDLOWER in Support. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit REQUEST FOR CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT).(Sheidlower, Eric)
February 12, 2025 Filing 19 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Sheidlower, Eric) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
February 12, 2025 Filing 18 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Sheidlower, Eric) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
February 12, 2025 Filing 17 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Sheidlower, Eric) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
February 12, 2025 Filing 16 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Sheidlower, Eric) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
January 6, 2025 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Advanced Oxy-Med Services, Inc. served on 12/30/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Boriskin, Sara)
January 6, 2025 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York State Department of Taxation and Finance served on 12/27/2024, answer due 1/17/2025. Service was accepted by CHRIS GATTO, ASSISTANT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Boriskin, Sara)
January 6, 2025 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Kyle Lucas served on 12/27/2024, answer due 1/17/2025. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Boriskin, Sara)
January 6, 2025 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sharon Lucas a/k/a Blackwell served on 12/27/2024, answer due 1/17/2025. Service was accepted by KYLE LUCAS. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Boriskin, Sara)
December 19, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kyle Lucas..(gp)
December 19, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advanced Oxy-Med Services, Inc...(gp)
December 19, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Department of Taxation and Finance..(gp)
December 19, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sharon Lucas a/k/a Blackwell..(gp)
December 19, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Boriskin on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Boriskin, Sara)
December 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anthony Cellucci. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Doe #1 through John Doe #12. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 19, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 19, 2024 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 19, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 18, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sharon Lucas a/k/a Sharon Blackwell, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Cellucci, Anthony)
December 18, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kyle Lucas, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Cellucci, Anthony)
December 18, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Cellucci, Anthony)
December 18, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advanced Oxy-Med Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,..(Cellucci, Anthony)
December 18, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cellucci, Anthony)
December 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Oxy-Med Services, Inc., John Doe #1 through John Doe #12, Kyle Lucas, Sharon Lucas a/k/a Blackwell, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30354302)Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G).(Cellucci, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5, v. Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Lucas a/k/a Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Oxy-Med Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1 through John Doe #12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2007-BR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-BR5,
Represented By: Anthony Cellucci
Represented By: Sara Boriskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?