Beacraft, IV v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Beacraft, IV
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2025cv01427
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Corey C. Kirkwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before his Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 9. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/16/2025) (mml)
April 16, 2025 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Corey C. Kirkwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30935122. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
April 15, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION for Corey C. Kirkwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30935122. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Corey C. Kirkwood, Esquire with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kirkwood, Corey)
April 9, 2025 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc...(Lyda, T.H.)
April 7, 2025 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corp. for CSX Transportation, Inc.. Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc...(Lyda, T.H.)
April 7, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by T.H. Lyda on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc...(Lyda, T.H.)
March 27, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 2/27/2025, answer due 3/20/2025. Service was accepted by Suzanne Short. Document filed by Daniel Beacraft, IV..(Wietzke, Marc)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CSX Transportation, Inc...(jgo)
February 20, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 20, 2025 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 20, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CSX Transportation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel Beacraft, IV..(Wietzke, Marc)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30645199)Document filed by Daniel Beacraft, IV..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beacraft, IV v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Beacraft, IV
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Christopher Kirkwood
Represented By: T.H. Lyda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?