Salamon v. Our Lady of Victory, et al

Case Number: 1:1999cv00048
Filed: January 21, 1999
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Anti-Trust Office
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER AMENDING the Court's Pretrial Order dated 1/16/2013 and amended on 6/3/203 as specified; DENYING Defendants' 233 234 235 236 Motions to Strike; SCHEDULING a Final Pretrial Conference for 9/27/2013 at 9:00 a.m. before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this Order and all subsequent Court decisions, orders, and notices to the Plaintiff at her address as specified. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 7/16/2013. - CLERK TO FOLLOW UP -(MEAL)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 169 175 176 Motions for Reconsideration; SCHEDULING a Status Conference for 7/24/2012 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/23/2012. (MEAL)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 101 104 106 107 Motions for Summary Judgment; SCHEDULING a Status Conference for 5/11/2012 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/30/2012. (MEAL)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 134 Motion to Seal defendants' supplemental affidavits, exhibits and memorandua of law. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 6/26/09. (SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salamon v. Our Lady of Victory, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?