Anson v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Donald James Anson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2007cv00035
Filed: January 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: H. Kenneth Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- ORDER appointing Anna Czarples, Esq. and Michael Donlon, Esq. of the Office of Jacob P. Welch, 8 Denison Parkway East, Ste. 207, Corning, New York 14830 as pro bono counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/6/2015. (CDH)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 115 Motion. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on November 2, 2011. (APG)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER affirming Magistrate Judge's Order 74 on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Schroeder for further proceedings. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 4/22/2010. (JMB)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECISION AND ORDER denying 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on March 23, 2010. (APG)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on July 23, 2009. (APG)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on July 17, 2009. (APG)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 50 Motion. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on May 22, 2009. (APG)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on May 18, 2009. (APG)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 31 ; denying 44 Motion for emergency stay. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 4/10/2009. (JMB)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on March 23, 2009. (gioia, allison)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anson v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald James Anson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lynn S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?