Yeldon v. Fisher et al
Plaintiff: Willie James Yeldon
Defendant: Brian Fisher, Glen Champagne, A. Deperio, Tom Edwards, Darryl Dirisio, Taesoo, Chen Dr. George-Pai, Daniel M. Downs and Habib Shiekh
Case Number: 1:2007cv00370
Filed: June 11, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 114 . A copy of the Order has been mailed to Willie James Yeldon, C-97716, CENTRAL NEW YORK PSYCHIATRIC CENTER, Box 300, Marcy, NY 13403. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 1/21/17. (LAS)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to vacate 103 is denied, and his motion to appoint counsel 104 is denied as moot. A copy of this entry has been mailed to Willie James Yeldon, C-97716, CENTRAL NEW YORK PSYCHIATRIC CENTER, Box 300, Marcy, NY 13403. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 11/23/16. (LAS)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 90 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 4/29/2013. (KER)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER terminating 81 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 82 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 5/26/2011. (KER)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 3/31/2011. (KER)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 56 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on September 15, 2009. (APG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeldon v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie James Yeldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Champagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Deperio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Dirisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taesoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Dr. George-Pai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Habib Shiekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?