Lewis v. Turco et al
Plaintiff: Michal Lewis
Defendant: Anthony D. Turco, James A. Marshall, John D. Capriccio, Scott Carpenter, Richard Portalatin, James P. O'Herron, Darryl K. Forrest, D. Napoli and Clement
Case Number: 1:2008cv00913
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: H. Kenneth Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER referring case to ADR and appointing pro bon counsel for mediation purposes only. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 12/9/2011. (KER)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 DECISION AND ORDER denying 139 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 139 Motion for TRO. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on July 11, 2011.(APG)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion to Produce; denying 128 Motion. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on July 8, 2011. (APG)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 DECISION AND ORDER denying 119 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 129 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on July 1, 2011. (APG)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DECISION AND ORDER denying 58 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on March 21, 2011. (APG)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECISION AND ORDER denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on June 1, 2010. (APG)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 2/18/2010. (KER)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Turco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michal Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony D. Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Capriccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Portalatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. O'Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl K. Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?